EP2343808 - ANALOG SIGNAL SAMPLING SYSTEM AND METHOD HAVING REDUCED AVERAGE INPUT CURRENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/28] | Analog signal sampling system and method having reduced average input current | ||
[2016/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linear Technology Corporation 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035-7417 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Linear Technology Corporation 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oprescu, Florin A. PO Box 8907 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2011/28] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11161019.2 | 17.10.2005 | [2011/28] | Priority number, date | US20040619007P | 18.10.2004 Original published format: US 619007 P | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2343808 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2343808 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343808 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/00, H03M1/14, H03M3/02 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
H03M3/322 (EP,US);
H03M1/00 (KR);
H03M3/43 (EP,US);
H03M3/456 (EP,US);
H03M3/496 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | H03M1/00, H03M3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2011/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANALOGSIGNAL-ABTASTSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN MIT VERMINDERTEM MITTLEREM DIFFERENZEINGANGSSTROM | [2016/50] | English: | ANALOG SIGNAL SAMPLING SYSTEM AND METHOD HAVING REDUCED AVERAGE INPUT CURRENT | [2016/52] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECHANTILLONNAGE DE SIGNAUX ANALOGIQUES ET METHODE PRESENTANT UN COURANT D'ENTREE DIFFERENTIEL MOYEN REDUIT | [2016/50] |
Former [2011/28] | Analogsignal-Abtastsystem und -Verfahren mit vermindertem mittlerem Differenzeingangsstrom | ||
Former [2011/28] | Analog signal sampling system and method having reduced average input current | ||
Former [2011/28] | Système d'échantillonnage de signaux analogiques et méthode présentant un courant d'entrée différentiel moyen réduit | Examination procedure | 05.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 18.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.2016 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 20.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2016 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05812353.0 / EP1805898 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050812353) is 25.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2005 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | IE | 17.10.2017 | LU | 17.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.10.2005 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.10.2005 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.10.2005 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5729232 (FUJIMORI ICHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-8,25 * column 2, lines 3-19; figures 1,6 * [Y] 14-24; | [XY]US5675340 (HESTER RICHARD KNIGHT [US], et al) [X] 14-25 * column 7, lines 60-end; figures 7,8,9 * [Y] 1-8; | [XY]US5017920 (FRENCH BARRY T [US]) [X] 14 * figure 2 * [Y] 1-8,15-25; | [Y]EP1193880 (UNIV COLLEGE CORK NAT UNIV IE [IE]) [Y] 1-8,14-25 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6535157 (GARRITY DOUGLAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,14-25 * figures 4,5 *; | [XY] - TAPANI RITONIEMI ET AL, "DESIGN OF STABLE HIGH ORDER 1-BIT SIGMA-DELTA MODULATORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. NEW ORLEANS, MAY 1 - 3, 1990; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19900501), vol. 4 OF 04, pages 3267 - 3270, XP000163530 [X] 1-8 * figure 6 * [Y] 14-25 | by applicant | US2006082481 | US2006082486 | US20040619007 |