EP2380762 - Suspension strut and method for producing a component of a suspension strut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zernickel, Alexander / Sternstrasse 3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
Neuwirth, Ernst / Anna-Herrmann-Strasse 58 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 11161093.7 | 05.04.2011 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | DE20101015712 | 21.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015712 | [2011/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380762 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60G15/06 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
B60G15/068 (EP,US);
B60G15/06 (KR);
F16C19/10 (KR);
B60G2204/128 (EP,US);
B60G2204/418 (EP,US);
B60G2206/013 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49643 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Federbeinlager und Herstellungsverfahren für ein Bauteil eines Federbeinlagers | [2011/43] | English: | Suspension strut and method for producing a component of a suspension strut | [2011/43] | French: | Jambe de force de ressort et procédé de fabrication d'un composant d'une jambe de force de ressort | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2803561 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 7 - line 12; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102005011408 (TRELLEBORG AUTOMOTIVE TECH CT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0030] - [0032]; figures 1,3,6 *; | [A]FR2909929 (SNR ROULEMENTS SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102007018160 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0023]; figure 1 *; | [I]FR2915929 (SNR ROULEMENTS SA [FR]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0007] , [0009] , [0000] , [0015] - [0017] - [0019] , [0030] - [0031]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2009106469 (SKF AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * page 8, line 15 - page 11, line 24 * [I] 8,10 | by applicant | DE3737770 | GB2347906 | DE10042677 | DE202004011432U | EP2128464 |