EP2372938 - Transmission rate adjustment method and radio communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tooyama, Hiroto c/o NTT DOCOMO, Inc. Intellectual Property Department Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Morihiro, Yoshifumi c/o NTT DOCOMO, Inc. Intellectual Property Department Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Makino, Kouji c/o NTT DOCOMO, Inc. Intellectual Property Department Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11161119.0 | 05.04.2011 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | JP20100087144 | 05.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010087144 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2372938 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2372938 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04W28/02 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
H04L1/1867 (EP,US);
H04L47/263 (EP,US);
H04L47/34 (EP,US);
H04W28/0247 (EP,US);
H04W28/0284 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | H04L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einstellung der Übertragungsrate und Funkkommunikationseinrichtungen | [2011/40] | English: | Transmission rate adjustment method and radio communication apparatus | [2011/40] | French: | Procédé de régulation du débit de transmission et dispositifs de radiocommunication | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 16.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008066427 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]EP2088816 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 14 - page 4, paragraph 26 *; | [A]US2009207772 (EHARA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 6, paragraph 85 * | by applicant | JP2010087144 |