EP2395651 - System and method for damping lc circuits in power conversion systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states General Electric Company a New York Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gong, Maozhong GE Global Research 1800 Cai Lun Road ZhangJiang Hi-Tech Park 201230 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
Tan, Zuohui GE Global Research 1800 Cai Lun Road ZhangJiang Hi-Tech Park 201230 Shanghai / CN | 03 /
Yuan, Xiaoming AP202, Bl. 47 No. 77 Caobao Road 201203 Shanghai / CN | 04 /
Wu, Xueqin GE Global Research 1800 Cai Lun Road ZhangJiang Hi-Tech Park 201230 Shanghai / CN | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11161633.0 | 08.04.2011 | [2011/50] | Priority number, date | CN20101153047 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: CN201010153047 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2395651 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2395651 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H02M1/12, // H02M7/42 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
H02M1/126 (EP);
H02M7/53871 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | H02M7/5387 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Dämpfung von LC-Schaltungen in Leistungswandlungssystemen | [2011/50] | English: | System and method for damping lc circuits in power conversion systems | [2011/50] | French: | Système et procédé d'amortissement des circuits CI dans des systèmes de conversion de puissance | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SERPA L A ET AL, "A Modified Direct Power Control Strategy Allowing the Connection of Three-Phase Inverters to the Grid Through Filters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070901), vol. 43, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TIA.2007.904438, ISSN 0093-9994, pages 1388 - 1400, XP011192497 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * Formulas 14-18; page 1391, column LH side, paragraph 2 - page 1392, column RH side, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIA.2007.904438 | [XI] - WILLIAM GULLVIK ET AL, "Active damping of resonance oscillations in LCL-filters based on virtual flux and virtual resistor", 2007 EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS, (20070101), doi:10.1109/EPE.2007.4417734, pages 1 - 10, XP055165918 [X] 1 * abstract * * Sections II and III * [I] 2-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EPE.2007.4417734 | [A] - Anonymous, "Short-Circuit Calculations A Handbook to Accompany the Online Short-Circuit Calculation Program from www", (20060825), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.arcadvisor.com/pdf/sccp_handbook.pdf, (20150129), XP055165916 [A] 1-10 * page 1 - page 3 * | by applicant | US6166929 |