EP2441769 - Design, synthesis and assembly of synthetic nucleic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REPLIGEN CORPORATION 41 Seyon Street Building 1 Suite 100 Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Govindarajan, Sridhar 530 Osprey Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
Kulikov, Nicolay V. 1270 Connecticut Drive Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
Minshull, Jeremy S. 679 Los Ninos Way Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
Ness, Jon E. 710 Bair Island Road, Nr. 405 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2012/16] | Application number, filing date | 11161698.3 | 04.05.2005 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | US20040567460P | 04.05.2004 Original published format: US 567460 P | US20050666909P | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 666909 P | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441769 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2441769 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, B01J19/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | AL | 08.04.2011 | BA | 08.04.2011 | HR | 08.04.2011 | LV | 08.04.2011 | MK | 08.04.2011 | YU | 08.04.2011 | Title | German: | Design, Synthese und Anordnung von synthetischen Nukleinsäuren | [2012/16] | English: | Design, synthesis and assembly of synthetic nucleic acids | [2012/16] | French: | Conception, synthèse et assemblage d'acides nucléiques synthétiques | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05780055.9 / EP1771579 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050780055) is 24.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2005 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/06] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004029781 (HERNAN RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim 21; sequence 4 *; | [A] - UHLEN M ET AL, "Complete sequence of the staphylococcal gene encoding protein A. A gene evolved through multiple duplications", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, (19840101), vol. 259, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1695 - 1702, XP008092291 [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - SHUTTLEWORTH H L ET AL, "Nucleotide sequence analysis of the gene for protein A from Staphylococcus aureus Cowan 1 (NCTC8530) and its enhanced expression in Escherichia coli", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 58, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(87)90383-0, ISSN 0378-1119, (19870101), pages 283 - 295, (19870101), XP023544339 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 293, column r - page 294, column left, paragraph 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(87)90383-0 | [A] - JING G ET AL, "High-level expression of staphylococcal nuclease R gene in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 22, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0168-1656(92)90145-Y, ISSN 0168-1656, (19920201), pages 271 - 282, (19920201), XP023705250 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 275, line 11 - line 35; figures 1-3; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(92)90145-Y | [T] - WELCH MARK ET AL, "Design Parameters to Control Synthetic Gene Expression in Escherichia coli", PLOS ONE, (200909), vol. 4, no. 9, ISSN 1932-6203, XP002670364 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0007002 | by applicant | US5681702 | US5780610 | US4598049 | - HAYDEN ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, pages 571 - 7 | - CICCARELLI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1991), vol. 19, pages 6007 - 13 | - JAYARAMAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1991), vol. 88, pages 4084 - 8 | - JAYARAMAN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, pages 392 - 8 | - GRAHAM ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1993), vol. 21, pages 4923 - 8 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1997), vol. 23, pages 500 - 3 | - AU ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (1998), vol. 248, pages 200 - 203 | - HOOVER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2002), vol. 30, page E43 | - GAIT, PRACTICAL APPROACH SERIES, (1984), vol. XIII, page 217 | - MATTEUCCI, CARUTHERS, J AM CHEM SOC., (1981), vol. 103, pages 3185 - 3191 | - PON ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1985), vol. 26, pages 2525 - 2528 | - ADAMS ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1983), vol. 105, pages 661 - 663 | - MCBRIDE ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1986), vol. 108, pages 2040 - 2048 | - LETSINGER ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1984), vol. 40, pages 137 - 143 | - HAYAKAWA ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1990), vol. 112, pages 1691 - 1696 | - HAYAKAWA, KATAOKA., J AM CHEM SOC, (1998), vol. 120, pages 12395 - 12401 | - PON, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, page 7203 | - HAYAKAWA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT, (1986), vol. 27, pages 4191 - 4194 | - PADIYA, SALUNKHE, J CHEM RESEARCH, (1998), page 804 | - EADIE, DAVIDSON, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, pages 8333 - 49 | - BOAL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1996), vol. 24, page 3115 | - KWIATKOWSKI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1996), vol. 24, pages 4632 - 4638 | - SWITZER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 32, pages 10489 - 10496 | - TOR ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, pages 4461 - 4467 | - MANTSCH ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 14, pages 5593 - 5601 | - PICCIRILLI ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 343, pages 33 - 37 | - LEACH ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, pages 3675 - 3683 | - GAIT, Gait's practical handbook, (1984), vol. XIII, page 217 | - BEAUCAGE, RADHAKRISHNAN, TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 48, pages 2223 - 2311 | - URDEA, HORN, TETRAHEDRON LETT, (1986), vol. 27, pages 2933 - 2936 | - BOLLEN ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 35, pages 393 - 432 | - MATTEUCCI, CARUTHERS, J AM CHEM SOC, (1981), vol. 103, pages 3185 - 3191 | - CHAIX ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT, (1989), vol. 30, pages 71 - 74 | - YU ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT, (1994), vol. 34, pages 8565 - 8568 | - PON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1985), vol. 13, pages 6447 - 65 | - PON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1986), vol. 14, pages 6453 - 70 | - LETSINGER ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1975), pages 3278 - 3279 | - PETRI ET AL., LANGMUIR, (1999), vol. 15, pages 4520 - 4523 | - ALLENMARK, ELLIS HORWOOD SERIES IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), page 224 | - BOAL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1996), vol. 24, pages 3115 - 7 | - CHU ET AL., ELECTROPHORESIS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 105 - 14 | - ITO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1982), vol. 10, page 1755 | - EADIE, DAVIDSON, 1987, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, vol. 15, pages 8333 - 49 | - SEPTAK, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1996), vol. 24, pages 3053 - 3058 | - PAUL, ROYAPPA, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1996), vol. 24, pages 3048 - 3052 | - BABON ET AL., MOL BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 23, pages 73 - 81 | - THOMAS ET AL., BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 383, pages 1459 - 1462 | - SMITH, MODRICH, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6847 - 6850 | - COTTON ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1998), vol. 85, pages 4397 - 4401 | - ROBERTS ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES, (1997), vol. 25, pages 3377 - 3378 | - BUI ET AL., BMC CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2003), page 3, URL: http://www.biomedcentral.com/content/pdf/1472-6769-3-I | - JUNICKE ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (2003), vol. 100, pages 3737 - 3742 | - HORTON ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 77, pages 61 - 8 | - HAYAKAWA, KATAOKA, J AM CHEM SOC, (1998), vol. 120, pages 12395 - 12401 | - SELIGER ET AL., J CHROMATOGR, (1989), vol. 476, pages 49 - 57 | - LEPROUST ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2001), vol. 29, pages 2171 - 80 |