EP2432220 - Stream file management apparatus and a method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Takahisa c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11161846.8 | 11.04.2011 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | JP20100210137 | 17.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010210137 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2432220 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2432220 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H04N21/4263 (EP);
H04N21/4135 (EP);
H04N21/4334 (EP);
H04N21/4345 (EP);
H04N21/4622 (EP);
H04N21/47214 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung von Stream-Dateien und Verfahren dafür | [2012/12] | English: | Stream file management apparatus and a method of the same | [2012/12] | French: | Appareil de gestion d'un fichier de flux et procédé correspondant | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2006033067 (SONY CORP) [I] 1-7 * abstract *; | [I]US2007094518 (ANDO HIDEO [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0676]; figures 1-84; claim 2 * * paragraph [1343] - paragraph [1392] *; | [I]US2007089159 (KIKUCHI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002069218 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-11; claims 1-80 * * paragraph [0372] - paragraph [0523] * |