EP2510961 - Infusion pump device with improved priming of the fluidic system and method for priming such an infusion pump device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geipel, Andreas Grünmattstrasse 8 4665, Oftringen / CH | 02 /
Dogwiller, Jörg Glärnischstrasse 6 8962, Bergdietikon / CH | 03 /
Haueter, Ulrich Kirchgasse 2 3506, Grosshöchstetten / CH | 04 /
Scheurer, Simon Thunstrasse 116 3006, Bern / CH | 05 /
Zihlmann, Ruedi Napfstrasse 25 3550, Langnau / CH | 06 /
Teutsch, David Schlattweg 6 3054, Schüpfen / CH | 07 /
Kühni, Florian Seftigenstrasse 226 3084, Wabern / CH | 08 /
Schaltegger, Reto Höheweg 18 3053, Münchenbuchsee / CH | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 11161986.2 | 12.04.2011 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2510961 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/168, A61M5/36, // A61M5/315, A61M5/14 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
A61M5/365 (EP,US);
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/16809 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1402 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14264 (EP,US);
A61M2005/16868 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3355 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Infusionspumpenvorrichtung mit verbesserter Auffüllung des Flüssigkeitssystems und Verfahren zum Auffüllen einer solchen Infusionspumpenvorrichtung | [2012/42] | English: | Infusion pump device with improved priming of the fluidic system and method for priming such an infusion pump device | [2012/42] | French: | Pompe à perfusion avec remplissage amélioré du système fluidique et procédé de remplissage dudit dispositif de pompe à perfusion | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1754505 (AUTOM PARTNERSHIP CAMBRIDGE [GB]) [X] 1,2,9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0018] - [0023] - [0025] *; | [I]US2008156476 (SMISSON HUGH F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0051] , [0089] , [0093] , [0099] , [0105] - [0106] - [0119] , [0132] *; | [I]WO2007133942 (ACIST MEDICAL SYSTEM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 15 * * page 13, lines 5-13 * * page 15, lines 3-16 * * page 19, line 21 - page 20, line 14 * * page 31, line 23 - page 32, line 21 * * page 36, line 16 - page 37, line 19 * * page 45, line 4 - page 48, line 27 * * claim 10 *; | [I]US5935105 (MANNING ROBERT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, lines 1-6,32-53 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 47 *; | [I]US2008086111 (COWAN KEVIN P [US], et al) [I] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0024] - [0055] * | by applicant | WO0183008 | EP1970677 | EP2163273 | EP2295096 |