EP2337405 - Method and apparatus for transmitting and receiving system information in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Kyeong-In c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Van der Velde, Himke Samsung Electronics Research Institute Communication House South Street Staines, Middlesex, TW18 4QE / GB | 03 /
Kim, Soeng-Hun c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Cho, Joon-Young c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/20] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Jeong, Kyeong-In c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-don Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Van der Velde, Himke Samsung Electronics Research Institute Communicat Staines, Middlesex, TW18 4QE / GB | |||
03 /
Kim, Soeng-Hun c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-don Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Cho, Joon-Young c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-don Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2011/25] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 DE-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11162030.8 | 06.02.2008 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | KR20070013863 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: KR 20070013863 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2337405 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2337405 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337405 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (KR,US);
H04L1/0057 (KR);
H04L65/611 (US);
H04W4/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2011/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Senden und Empfangen von Systeminformationen in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem | [2011/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for transmitting and receiving system information in a mobile communication system | [2011/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil de transmission et de réception d'informations de système dans un système de communication mobile | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 29.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08002173.6 / EP1959704 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080002173) is 03.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003061557 (CHAO YI-JU [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1, paragraph 15 * * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 2 * * page 3, paragraph 34 - paragraph 35 * * page 2, paragraph 33 - page 3, paragraph 34 *; | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (3GPP TS 25.331 version 7.3.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 125 331", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20061201), vol. 3-R2, no. V7.3.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014040018 [A] 1-17 * page 52, paragraph 8.1.1.1.5 * * page 364, line 12 - line 13 * * page 744, paragraph 10.3.7.103 - page 745 * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, FUJITSU, NEC, SHARP, TOSHIBA CORPORATION, "Broadcast Channel Structure for E-UTRA Downlink", Cannes, France, no. R1-061665, (20060627), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_June-06/Docs/, (20080708), XP002487783 [A] 1-17 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, line 6 - line 20 * * page 2; table 1 * * page 1, line 15 - line 23 * * page 4, paragraph 3.2 - page 5; figure 4 * * page 7, paragraph 3.4 - page 8 * * page 8, line 15 - line 23 * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Scheduling and organisation of flexible system information", Sorrento, Italy, no. R2-070168, (20070115), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_56bis/Documents/, (20080708), XP002487784 [A] 1-17 * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 7; table 2 * | [A] - MOTOROLA, "P-BCH Scheduling", Riga, Latvia, no. R2-063412, (20061106), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_56/Documents/, (20080710), XP002487785 [A] 1-17 * page 4, paragraph 2.1.3 - page 5, paragraph 3 * |