EP2511726 - A method and system for determining the flip angle in the transient phase of a gradient echo pulse sequence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klinikum rechts der Isar der Technischen Universität München Ismaninger Straße 22 81675 München / DE | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ganter, Carl Attenhauserstrasse 14 82057 Icking-Dorfen / DE | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11162302.1 | 13.04.2011 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2511726 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/58, G01R33/44 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
G01R33/443 (EP);
G01R33/583 (EP);
G01R33/586 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bestimmung des Pulswinkels in der Übergangsphase einer Gradientenechoimpulsfolge | [2012/42] | English: | A method and system for determining the flip angle in the transient phase of a gradient echo pulse sequence | [2012/42] | French: | Procédé et système permettant de déterminer l'angle de bascule dans la phase transitoire d'une séquence d'impulsion écho gradient | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - C.GANTER ET AL., "B1-Mapping with the Transient Phase of SSFP", PROC.INTL.SOC.MAG.RESON.MED. 19, (20110423), page 4427, XP002658100 [T] * the whole document * | [ID] - C. GANTER, "Analytical Solution to the Transient Phase of Steady-State Free Precession Sequences", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (2009), vol. 62, pages 149 - 164, XP002658101 [ID] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/MRM.21968 | [A] - C.K.ANAND ET AL., "Steady State Spectroscopy - CW NMR Lives !", MOOT 2006, 19TH ANNUAL MOOT CONFERENCE 23-24 SEPTEMBER 2006, UNIVERSITY OF GUELPH, CANADA, (2006), XP002658102 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - METZ K R ET AL, "RAPID ROTATING-FRAME IMAGING USING AN RF PULSE TRAIN (RIPT)", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE. SERIES B, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (19940201), vol. 103, no. 2, doi:10.1006/JMRB.1994.1023, ISSN 1064-1866, pages 152 - 161, XP000429858 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmrb.1994.1023 | [A] - TALAGALA S L ET AL, "EXPERIMENTAL DETERMINATION OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL RF MAGNETIC FIELD DISTRIBUTION OF NMR COILS", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (19911001), vol. 94, no. 3, ISSN 1090-7807, pages 493 - 500, XP000235338 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - I.J.LOWE ET AL., "Homogeneous rf field delay line probe for pulsed nuclear magnetic resonance", REV.SCI.INSTRUM., (1977), vol. 48, pages 268 - 274, XP002658103 [A] 1-15 * see chapter IIC * | by applicant | - L. SACOLICK ET AL., MAGN RESON MED 2010;63:315 OR V. YARNYKH, MAGN RESON MED, (2010), vol. 63, page 1610 | - K. SCHEFFLER, CONCEPT MAGN RESON A, (1999), vol. 11, page 291 | - C. GANTER, "Analytical Solution to the Transient Phase of Steady State Free Procession Sequences", MAGN RESON MED, (2009), vol. 62, page 149 | - Y Y. LIN, JMR, (1997), vol. 128, page 30 |