EP2515434 - Electronic device with increased immunity to audio noise from system ground currents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poulsen, Jens Kristian 305 Philip St, Extension: 70873 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
Zhang, Yong 295 Phillip Street Ext 70573 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11162808.7 | 18.04.2011 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2515434 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515434 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30, H04B15/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H03F1/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung mit erhöhter Immunität gegenüber Geräuschen von Systemerdströmen | [2012/43] | English: | Electronic device with increased immunity to audio noise from system ground currents | [2012/43] | French: | Dispositif électronique avec immunité améliorée aux bruits audio provenant des courants à la terre de système | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2011 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13174132.4 / EP2645564 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2011 | AL | 04.09.2013 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MK | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | RS | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | SM | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | NO | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | IE | 18.04.2014 | LU | 18.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.04.2011 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MK | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
RS | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.04.2011 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
RS | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.04.2011 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
RS | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
RS | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | |
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5751823 (STRICKLAND JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 33 - line 53; figure 3 *; | [A]US2002186853 (ANDERSON JEFFREY S [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037]; figure 3 *; | [A]US7769187 (FARRAR DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 15, line 38 - column 21, line 23; figures 6, 7 * |