EP2514765 - Gpr177 as target and marker in tumors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg Grabengasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des Öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg Grabengasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boutros, Michael Marstallstr. 11 69117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Augustin, Iris Kirchstraße 58 69221 Dossenheim / DE | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Heubeck, Christian Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Heubeck, Christian Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11162877.2 | 18.04.2011 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514765 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C12N15/113, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C07K14/723 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/5041 (US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
G01N33/57492 (US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
G01N2333/726 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/14, C12N2310/531 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GPR177 als Target und Marker bei Tumoren | [2012/43] | English: | Gpr177 as target and marker in tumors | [2012/43] | French: | Gpr177 en tant que cible et marqueur des tumeurs | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006097336 (GENETICS CO INC [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 2 * * sequence 6 * * page 8, line 9 - line 16 * * page 11, line 21 - line 26 * * page 17, line 18 - line 30 * * figure 9 * [I] 4,6,12,15; | [A] - BARTSCHERER K ET AL, "Secretion of Wnt ligands requires Evi, a conserved transmembrane protein", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20060505), vol. 125, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2006.04.009, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 523 - 533, XP002385896 [A] 1-6,10-12,15 * page 524, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 525, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 529, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 530, column r, paragraph 2 * * figures 2D, 6B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2006.04.009 | [A] - BARKER NICK ET AL, "Mining the Wnt pathway for cancer therapeutics", NATURE REVIEWS. DRUG DISCOVERY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20061201), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1038/NRD2154, ISSN 1474-1784, pages 997 - 1014, XP002545380 [A] 1-6,10-12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRD2154 | [A] - LOGAN CATRIONA Y ET AL, "The Wnt signaling pathway in development and disease", ANNUAL REVIEW OF CELL AND DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, ANNUAL REVIEWS, US, (20040101), vol. 20, doi:10.1146/ANNUREV.CELLBIO.20.010403.113126, ISSN 1081-0706, ISBN 978-0-8243-3113-9, pages 781 - 810, XP002451677 [A] 1-6,10-12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.cellbio.20.010403.113126 | [AD] - J. FU ET AL, "Reciprocal regulation of Wnt and Gpr177/mouse Wntless is required for embryonic axis formation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20091103), vol. 106, no. 44, doi:10.1073/pnas.0904894106, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 18598 - 18603, XP055006717 [AD] 1-6,10-12,15 * page 18602, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0904894106 | [A] - JAY JIN ET AL, "Expression of GPR177 (Wntless/Evi/Sprinter), a highly conserved Wnt-transport protein, in rat tissues, zebrafish embryos, and cultured human cells", DEVELOPMENTAL DYNAMICS, (20100901), vol. 239, no. 9, doi:10.1002/dvdy.22369, ISSN 1058-8388, pages 2426 - 2434, XP055006723 [A] 1-6,10-12,15 * abstract * * figure 3 * * page 2432, column r, paragraph 5 - page 2433, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dvdy.22369 | by applicant | - FU ET AL., PNAS, (2009), vol. 106, no. 44, pages 18598 - 18603 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MAACK PUBLISHING CO. |