EP2399720 - Slip resistant gloves and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Glove Co. 565, Tohori Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0802 / JP | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Ryo c/o SHOWA GLOVE CO. 565, Tohori Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0802 / JP | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Fickert, Stefan Christopher Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Fickert, Stefan Christopher Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11163228.7 | 20.04.2011 | [2011/52] | Priority number, date | JP20100103970 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010103970 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399720 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/00, B29C41/14, A41D19/00, A41D19/015, B29D99/00 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
A41D19/0065 (EP,US);
A41D19/01558 (EP,US);
B29C41/003 (EP,US);
B29C41/14 (EP,US);
B29C59/02 (EP,US);
B29C2059/028 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0064 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0072 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0087 (EP,US);
B29L2031/4864 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antirutschhandschuhe und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2011/52] | English: | Slip resistant gloves and method for producing the same | [2011/52] | French: | Gants anti-dérapages et leur procédé de fabrication | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 17.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007204381 (THOMPSON ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0 53] * [I] 3,5-9; | [A]EP2143551 (TOWA CORP LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0068] *; | [A]WO2005002375 (ANSELL HEALTHCARE PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [0 26] *; | [AD]JP2007524771 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006075980 (ANSELL HEALTHCARE PROD LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0051] *; | [AD]JP2002020913 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] , [0044] *; | [A]US2997746 (O'BRIEN WILLIAM J, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 17 - line 59 * * column 4, line 7 - line 46 * | by applicant | JP2639415B | JP2002020913 | JP2007524771 | JP2000096322 | JP2007052477 |