EP2383027 - User interface processing apparatus, method of processing user interface, and non-transitory computer-readable medium embodying computer program for processing user interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as "Square Enix Co., Ltd.") 6-27-30 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8430 / JP | [2015/43] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7, Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ando, Takehiro c/o SQUARE ENIX Co., Ltd. 6-27-30 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8430 / JP | 02 /
Aoyagi, Hidetoshi c/o SQUARE ENIX Co., Ltd. 6-27-30 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8430 / JP | [2016/02] |
Former [2011/44] | 01 /
Ando, Takehiro c/o SQUARE ENIX Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | ||
02 /
Aoyagi, Hidetoshi c/o SQUARE ENIX Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | Representative(s) | Pitchford, James Edward Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Pitchford, James Edward Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2012/40] | Pitchford, James Edward Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/21] | Pitchford, James Edward Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/44] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11163846.6 | 27.04.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | JP20100103234 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010103234 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383027 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383027 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2383027 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/2145, // A63F13/537 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
A63F13/2145 (EP,US);
A63F13/42 (EP,US);
A63F13/25 (EP,US);
A63F13/537 (EP,US);
A63F13/67 (EP,US);
A63F13/79 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
A63F13/822 (EP);
A63F2300/1075 (EP,US);
A63F2300/308 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6027 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | A63F13/10, G06F3/048, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2011/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Benutzerschnittstellen-Verarbeitungsvorrichtung, Verfahren zur Verarbeitung der Benutzerschnittstelle und nicht transitorisches computerlesbares Medium zur Verarbeitung der Benutzerschnittstelle | [2011/44] | English: | User interface processing apparatus, method of processing user interface, and non-transitory computer-readable medium embodying computer program for processing user interface | [2011/44] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'interface utilisateur, procédé de traitement de l'interface utilisateur et programme informatique intégrant un support lisible sur ordinateur non transitoire pour traiter l'interface utilisateur | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13186471.2 / EP2687276 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2011 | AL | 13.01.2016 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | RS | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IE | 27.04.2016 | LU | 27.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.04.2011 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.04.2011 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.04.2011 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5617114 (BIER ERIC A [US], et al) [I] 1,12,13 * sections 2.02, 2.04, 2.05, 3.11 *;; figures 5,6,26,29 * [A] 3,4; | [Y]US5726688 (SIEFERT DAVID M [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 5, paragraphs 5-15; figures 2-4 * * column 6, paragraphs 1-13 *; | [Y]US2003222856 (FEDORAK MARK V [CA], et al) [Y] 8-11* paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0011] - [0016] - [0019] - [0022] - [0048] - [0056]; figures 1,3,4,7,8,9 *; | [XYI]US2004263487 (MAYORAZ EDDY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0017] , [0021] , [0022] , [0025] - [0029]; figures 3-5 * [Y] 3-11 [I] 4; | [Y]US2006050865 (KORTUM PHILIP T [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0020] , [2138] , [0044]; claims 9,13,44 *; | [Y]US2007018950 (OHTA KEIZO [JP]) [Y] 8-11 * paragraphs [0061] - [0065] - [0077] , [0078] , [0100]; figures 10,11 *; | [Y]US2007265081 (SHIMURA YUKIMI [US], et al) [Y] 5-11 * paragraphs [0048] , [0052] - [0055] - [0063] , [0065] , [0108]; figures 1,5,6,8 * | by applicant | JP2008183047 | JP2010103234 |