EP2382989 - Method for preparing recombinant antigen complex using rotavirus nanoparticle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chung-Ang University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-756 / KR | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Won Yong 213-503 Hangaram Apt. 409 Ichon-dong Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-030 / KR | 02 /
Chung, In Sik 109-1102 Samsung Saemian-Apt. Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-270 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jong-Bum c/o National Academy of Agriculture Science Functional Biomaterial Division 249 Seodun-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 441-707 / KR | 04 /
Shon, Dong-Hwa 106-1001 YimGwang Apt. 393 Sangha-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-516 / KR | 05 /
Than, Van Thai Chung-ang University College of Medicine 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-756 / KR | 06 /
Yoon, Jang Won 856-15 Anyang 2-dong Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 430-012 / KR | 07 /
Park, Joo Hyoung 2-705 Kukdong Apt. Oksu-dong Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-766 / KR | 08 /
Baek, In-Hyuk 6-607 Hyosung Sang-a Apt. Mansu-dong Namdong-gu Incheon 405-755 / KR | [2012/06] |
Former [2011/45] | 01 /
Kim, Won Yong 213-503 Hangaram Apt. 409 Ichon-dong Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-030 / KR | ||
02 /
Chung, In Sik 109-1102 Samsung Saemian-Apt. Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-270 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Jong-Bum 4-1207 Samhwan Apt. Guun-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do 441-340 / KR | |||
04 /
Shon, Dong-Hwa 106-1001 YimGwang Apt. 393 Sangha-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-516 / KR | |||
05 /
Than, Van Thai Chung-ang University College of Medicine 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-756 / KR | |||
06 /
Yoon, Jang Won 856-15 Anyang 2-dong Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 430-012 / KR | |||
07 /
Park, Joo Hyoung 2-705 Kukdong Apt. Oksu-dong Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-766 / KR | |||
08 /
Baek, In-Hyuk 6-607 Hyosung Sang-a Apt. Mansu-dong Namdong-gu Incheon 405-755 / KR | Representative(s) | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/24] | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11163914.2 | 27.04.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | KR20100041095 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: KR 20100041095 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382989 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382989 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/29, A61K39/15, C07K14/10, C07K14/14 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/15 (EP,US);
A61K39/29 (EP,US);
A61P31/14 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (KR);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/866 (KR);
G01N33/56983 (US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/627 (EP,US);
A61K2039/64 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2720/12322 (EP,US);
C12N2720/12334 (EP,US);
C12N2770/32234 (EP,US);
C12N2770/32422 (EP,US);
C12N2770/32434 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2011/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines rekombinanten Antigenkomplexes unter Verwendung eines Rotavirus-Nanopartikel | [2011/44] | English: | Method for preparing recombinant antigen complex using rotavirus nanoparticle | [2011/44] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un complexe d'antigène recombinant au moyen de nanoparticules de rotavirus | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2011 | AL | 29.06.2016 | AT | 29.06.2016 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | RS | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.04.2011 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.04.2011 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.04.2011 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 29.06.2016 | |
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2009148964 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0183] * [Y] 14; | [XY]EP1576877 (BIOPROTEIN TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-13,15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0052]; claim 22 * [Y] 14; | [X] - PERALTA ANDREA ET AL, "Chimeric recombinant rotavirus-like particles as a vehicle for the display of heterologous epitopes", VIROLOGY JOURNAL, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20091106), vol. 6, no. 192, doi:10.1186/1743-422X-6-192, ISSN 1743-422X, pages 1 - 9, XP021064300 [X] 1,6-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-422X-6-192 | [X] - ESTES M K ET AL, "Virus-like particle vaccines for mucosal immunization.", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 412, ISSN 0065-2598, pages 387 - 395, XP009151593 [X] 1,6,7,11-13 * the whole document * * page 393, paragraph 1 * | [A] - Cortes-Perez N. G. et al., "Rotavirus-like particles: a novel nanocarrier for the gut.", Journal of biomedicine & biotechnology, doi:10.1155/2010/317545, ISSN 1110-7251, (20100413), Database accession no. 317545, pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.hindawi.com/journals/jbb/2010/317545/, (20110829), XP002657796 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2010/317545 | [A] - CLARK K B ET AL, "Expression and characterization of human group C rotavirus virus-like particles in insect cells", VIROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, US, vol. 387, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2009.02.023, ISSN 0042-6822, (20090510), pages 267 - 272, (20090312), XP026021085 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2009.02.023 | Examination | - Van Thai Than ET AL, "Expression of Recombinant Rotavirus Proteins Harboring Antigenic Epitopes of the Hepatitis A Virus Polyprotein in Insect Cells", Biomolecules and Therapeutics, (20120531), vol. 20, no. 3, doi:10.4062/biomolther.2012.20.3.320, ISSN 1976-9148, pages 320 - 325, XP055164837 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4062/biomolther.2012.20.3.320 | by applicant | - PATEL ET AL., PEDIATR INFECT DIS J, (2011), vol. 30, pages S1 - S5 | - ESTES, COHEN, "Rotavirus gene structure and function", MICROBIAL REV, (1989), vol. 53, pages 410 - 449 | - BANYAI ET AL., ARCH VIROL, (2009), vol. 154, pages 1823 - 1829 | - MATTHIJNSSENS ET AL., FUTURE MICROBIOL, (2009), vol. 4, pages 1303 - 1316 | - PARASHAR ET AL., EMERG INFECT DIS, (2003), vol. 9, pages 565 - 572 | - GUST ET AL., VACCINE, (1992), vol. 10, pages S56 - S8 | - TOTSUKA ET AL., INTERVIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 42, pages 63 - 68 | - WHO, MMWR WKLY EPIDEMIOL REC, (2000), vol. 75, pages 38 - 44 | - GIMMI, E. R. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 6983 - 6998 | - SCHEK, N ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL, (1992), vol. 12, pages 5386 - 5393 | - KLASENS, B. . F ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 26, pages 1870 - 1876 | - GIL, A. ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 49, pages 399 - 406 | - COLE, C. N., T. P. STACY, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 2104 - 2113 | - BATT, D. B, G. G. CARMICHAEL, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 15, pages 4783 - 4790 | - CAPECCHI, M.R., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, page 479 | - GRAHAM, F.L. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, page 456 | - NEUMANN, E., EMBO J., (1982), vol. 1, page 841 | - WONG, T.K. ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 10, page 87 | - GOPAL, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 1188 - 1190 | - YANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1990), vol. 87, pages 9568 - 9572 | - HILL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5791 | - EAGLE, H., SCIENCE, (1959), vol. 130, page 432 | - STANNER, C.P. ET AL., NAT. NEW BIOL., (1971), vol. 230, page 52 | - ISCOVE, N. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1978), vol. 147, page 923 | - MORGAN ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIO. MED., (1950), vol. 73, page 1 | - MOORE ET AL., J. AMER. MED. ASSOC., (1967), vol. 199, page 519 | - HAM, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1965), vol. 53, page 288 | - HAM, R.G., EXP. CELL RES., (1963), vol. 29, page 515 | - DULBECCO, R. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1959), vol. 8, page 396 | - BARNES, D. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 102, page 255 | - WAYMOUTH, C. J., NATL. CANCER INST., (1959), vol. 22, page 1003 | - MCCOY, T.A. ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (1959), vol. 100, page 115 | - HAM, R.G. ET AL., IN VITRO, (1978), vol. 14, page 11 | - R. IAN FRESHNEY, Culture of Animal Cells, A Manual of Basic Technique, ALAN R. LISS, INC. |