EP2397132 - Retinal derivatives and methods for the use thereof for the treatment of visual disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington Intellectual Property and Technology Transfer, 4311, 11th Avenue NE Suite 500, Campus Box 354990 Seattle, WA 98105-4608 / US | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palczewski, Krzysztof 29720 Lake Road Bay Village, OH 44140 / US | 02 /
Batten, Matthew 510 Coventry Road Decatur, GA 30030 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/51] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11163943.1 | 20.06.2005 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | US20040580889P | 18.06.2004 Original published format: US 580889 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2397132 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2397132 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2397132 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/22, A61K31/225, C07C403/12, C07C403/10, C07C403/14, C07C403/20 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/225 (EP,US);
A61K31/215 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C07C403/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
C07C403/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07C403/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07C403/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07C69/52 (NO);
C07B2200/09 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2011/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 10.01.2013 | BA | 10.01.2013 | HR | 10.01.2013 | LV | 10.01.2013 | MK | 10.01.2013 | YU | 10.01.2013 | Title | German: | Retinalderivate und Anwendungsverfahren für die Behandlung von Sehstörungen | [2011/51] | English: | Retinal derivatives and methods for the use thereof for the treatment of visual disorders | [2011/51] | French: | Dérivé de la rétine et leurs procédés d'utilisation dans le traitement des troubles visuels | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2016 | 15.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05773576.3 / EP1765322 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050773576) is 22.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2005 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.06.2005 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 20.06.2005 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06340525 ; | [A]JPH08198746 ; | [A]RU2106843 ; | [A] - NOELL, G. N., "Suitability of retinol, retinal and retinyl palmitate for the regeneration of bleached rhodopsin in the isolated frog retina", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1985:164043, URL: STN, XP002486105 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - SEMENOVA, EKATERINA M. ET AL, "Stabilization of all-trans-retinol by cyclodextrins: A comparative study using HPLC and fluorescence spectroscopy", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:494986, URL: STN, XP002475883 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - SEMENOVA, EKATERINA M. ET AL, "Systems for delivery of vitamin A to the retina in retinitis pigmentosa", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:438129, URL: STN, XP002475884 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - KUBO, YOSHIKAZU ET AL, "Effect of vitamin A palmitate on vitamin A-deficient rabbits", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:172779, URL: STN, XP002475885 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - RADOMSKA, A. ET AL, "The use of some ingredients for microemulsion preparation containing retinol and its esters", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:139945, URL: STN, XP002475886 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - CARUSO, RAFAEL C. ET AL, "Effects of fenretinide (4-HPR) on dark adaptation", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1998:418096, URL: STN, XP002475887 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 09, Database accession no. 1995-063773, XP002475888 & JPH06340525 A 19941213 (LION CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 41, Database accession no. 1996-408307, XP002475889 & JPH08198746 A 19960806 (LION CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 44, Database accession no. 1998-518867, XP002475890 & RU2106843 C1 19980320 (KRASY MED ACAD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | - NOLL ET AL, "Suitability of retinol, retinal and retinyl palmitate for the regeneration of bleached rhodopsin in the isolated frog retina", VISION RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 24, no. 11, doi:10.1016/0042-6989(84)90319-5, ISSN 0042-6989, (19840101), pages 1615 - 1622, (19840101), XP024402158 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6989(84)90319-5 | by applicant | - ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 272, pages 232 - 42 | - ANGEW. CHEM., (1997), vol. 36, pages 2089 - 93 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1975), vol. 14, pages 3933 - 41 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 21, pages 384 - 93 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28, pages 2732 - 39 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, pages 408 - 16 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 6257 - 62 | - BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 27, pages 372 - 82 | - BIOPHYS. CHEM., (1995), vol. 56, pages 31 - 39 | - BIOPHYS. J., (1989), vol. 56, pages 1259 - 65 | - BIOPHYS. J., (2002), vol. 83, pages 3460 - 69 | - CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 7, pages 4198 - 204 | - CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 5, pages 1172 - 75 | - FEBS, (1983), vol. 158, page 1 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1982), vol. 104, pages 3214 - 16 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1986), vol. 108, pages 6077 - 78 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1987), vol. 109, page 6163 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 7779 - 82 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 5758 - 59 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 121, pages 5803 - 04 | - J. AMERICAN CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, pages 10024 - 29 | - J. AMERICAN CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, pages 7294 - 302 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 26148 - 53 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 277, pages 42315 - 24 | - J. CHEM. SOC. - PERKIN T., (1997), vol. 1, pages 1773 - 77 | - J. CHEM. SOC. - PERKIN T., (2001), vol. 1, pages 2430 - 39 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1984), vol. 49, pages 649 - 52 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, pages 3533 - 37 | - J. PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (1998), vol. 102, pages 2787 - 806 | - LIPIDS, vol. 8, pages 558 - 65 | - PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1986), vol. 13, pages 259 - 83 | - PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1986), vol. 44, pages 803 - 07 | - PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1991), vol. 54, pages 969 - 76 | - PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1994), vol. 60, pages 64 - 68 | - PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 1047 - 55 | - PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (2002), vol. 70, pages 111 - 15 | - PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (2002), vol. 76, pages 606 - 615 | - PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 9412 - 16 | - PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 4072 - 76 | - PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 13442 - 47 | - PROC. R. SOC. LOND. SERIES B, BIOL. SCI., (1988), vol. 233, no. 1270, pages 55 - 76 | - VAN HOOSER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 8623 - 28 | - VAN HOOSER ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 19173 - 82 | - BAEHR ET AL., VISION RES., (2003), vol. 43, pages 2957 - 58 | - BATTEN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 10422 - 32 | - KUKSA ET AL., VISION RES., (2003), vol. 43, pages 2959 - 81 | - THOMPSON ET AL., DEV. OPHTHALMOL., (2003), vol. 37, pages 141 - 54 | - CAPECCHI, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1288 - 92 | - TELLER, BIOCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 40, pages 7761 - 72 | - Ophthalmic Surgery: Principles ofPractice, W. B. SANDERS CO., (1990), pages 85 - 87 | - RAO ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1990), vol. 31, pages 3441 - 44 | - VAN HOOSER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 19173 - 182 | - MAEDA ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (2003), vol. 85, pages 944 - 56 | US20040538051 | WO2004US07937 |