EP2383805 - Light emitting device package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | Light emitting device package and lighting system having the same | ||
[2015/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd Seoul Square 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd Seoul Square 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Bum Chul Seoul Square 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu 100-714, Seoul / KR | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2016/07] |
Former [2011/44] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 11164003.3 | 28.04.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | KR20100039396 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: KR 20100039396 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383805 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383805 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2383805 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/48, H01L33/64, // H01L33/62 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
H01L33/647 (EP,US);
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21Y2105/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/13 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2011/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Gehäuse für lichtemittierendes Bauelement | [2015/33] | English: | Light emitting device package | [2015/33] | French: | Emballage de dispositif électroluminescent | [2015/33] |
Former [2011/44] | Gehäuse für lichtemittierende Vorrichtung und Beleuchtungssystem damit | ||
Former [2011/44] | Light emitting device package and lighting system having the same | ||
Former [2011/44] | Emballage de dispositif électroluminescent et système d'éclairage l'incluant | Examination procedure | 02.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2011 | AL | 17.02.2016 | AT | 17.02.2016 | BE | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | HR | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | RS | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | SM | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | IE | 28.04.2016 | LU | 28.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | NO | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005082561 (SUEHIRO YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0108]; figures 1A-5B *; | [A]US2007246724 (WEN AN-NONG [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039]; figures 2-6 *; | [I]EP1876653 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0152]; figures 3-19 * * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]US2009289272 (KIM GEUN HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-18 *; | [A]KR20100039678 (SAMSUNG LED CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |