EP2518243 - Electric household appliance comprising a door locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | Electric household appliance door locking device | ||
[2019/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [2019/24] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biasiotto, Marco Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080, Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
Luchetti, Tommaso Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080, Porcia (PN) / IT | 03 /
Arrigoni, Giancarlo Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080, Porcia (PN) / IT | 04 /
Fabbro, Edi Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080, Porcia (PN) / IT | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2019/24] |
Former [2012/44] | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 11164054.6 | 28.04.2011 | [2012/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2518243 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2518243 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/00, D06F39/14 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
E05B47/0009 (EP,US);
D06F37/42 (EP,US);
D06F39/14 (EP,US);
F24C15/022 (EP);
A47L15/0049 (EP);
A47L15/4259 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2012/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Elektrisches Haushaltsgerät mit einer Türverriegelungsvorrichtung | [2019/03] | English: | Electric household appliance comprising a door locking device | [2019/03] | French: | Appareil électroménager comportant un dispositif de verrouillage de porte | [2019/03] |
Former [2012/44] | Türverriegelungsvorrichtung für ein elektrisches Haushaltsgerät | ||
Former [2012/44] | Electric household appliance door locking device | ||
Former [2012/44] | Dispositif de verrouillage de porte d'appareil électroménager | Examination procedure | 23.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2011 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1619287 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1 * the whole document *[A] 3; | [XA]WO2006095241 (ODINJSKE APARATE D O O ITW MET [SI], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 3 |