EP2383855 - Arc flash detection system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/35] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states General Electric Company a New York Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Juntao GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Room Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Xia, Hua GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Room Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Deveaux, Robert GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Room Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 04 /
Mao, Zhihong GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Room Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 05 /
Allcock, David John GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Room Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 06 /
Chen, Qin GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Room Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/35] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/44] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11164071.0 | 28.04.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | US20100770827 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: US 770827 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383855 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383855 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2383855 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02H1/00 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H02H1/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Title | German: | Lichtbogenblitzerkennungssystem und -verfahren | [2011/44] | English: | Arc flash detection system and method | [2011/44] | French: | Système de détection d'arc et procédé | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2011 | AL | 28.08.2013 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | HR | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | RS | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | NO | 28.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | IE | 28.04.2014 | LU | 28.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 28.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2007014060 (LAND H B III [US], et al) [Y] 8-12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0019] , [0020] , [0044] - [0054]; figures 5-7 * [A] 1-7; | [YA]US2008075404 (CHIN KEN K [US], et al) [Y] 8-12 * paragraph [0007]; figure 6; claims 8-16 * * abstract * [A] 1-7; | [XP]WO2010147832 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [XP] 8-12 * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line 18; figures 2-7 * |