EP2363102 - Magnetic force devices, systems, and methods for resisting tissue collapse within the pharyngeal conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelson, Lionel, M. P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Lax, Ronald, G. P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Doelling, Eric, N. P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Liu, Jinfang P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Muller, Peter, H. P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
Boucher, Ryan P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
Reo, Michael P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/36] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11164228.6 | 06.09.2003 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | US20020236455 | 06.09.2002 Original published format: US 236455 | US20030441639P | 22.01.2003 Original published format: US 441639 P | US20030456164P | 20.03.2003 Original published format: US 456164 P | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2363102 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2363102 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2363102 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/20 (EP,US);
A61F2/00 (EP,US);
A61F5/566 (EP,US);
A61F2210/009 (EP,US);
Y10S602/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen mit Magnetkraft, Systeme und Verfahren zur Bekämpfung des Gewebekollapses im Rachenausgang | [2011/36] | English: | Magnetic force devices, systems, and methods for resisting tissue collapse within the pharyngeal conduit | [2011/36] | French: | Dispositifs à force magnétique, systèmes et procédés permettant de résister à l'affaissement d'un tissu dans le conduit pharyngien | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 23.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03752056.6 / EP1549197 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2003 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | IE | 06.09.2014 | LU | 06.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GB | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.09.2003 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.09.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.09.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.09.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
SE | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5176618 (FREEDMAN GEORGE [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5176618 | - SCHWAB RJ, GOLDBERG AN., "Upper Airway Assessment: Radiographic and other Imaging Techniques", OTOLARYNGOL CLIN NORTH AM, (1998), vol. 31, pages 931 - 968 | - ISONO S. REMMERS J, TANAKA A SHO Y, SATO J, NISHINO T., "Anatomy ofpharynx in Patients with Obstructive Sleep Apnea and in Normal Subjects", J APPL PHYSIOL, (1997), vol. 82, pages 1319 - 1326 | - SHELLOCK FG, SCHATZ CJ, JULIEN P, SILVERMAN JM, STEINBERG F, OO TKF, HOPP ML, WESTBROOK PR., "Occlusion and Narrowing of the Pharyngeal Airway in Obstructive Sleep Apnea: Evaluation by Ultrafast Spoiled GRASS MR Imaging", AM J OF ROENTGENOLOGY, (1992), vol. 158, pages 1019 - 1024 |