EP2383488 - A clip and a weight for a wheel balance assembly and a method of manufacture of a wheel balance assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trax Jh Ltd. 66 Mochdre Enterprise Park Newtown, Powys SY16 4LE / GB | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halle, John C/O 66 Mochdre Enterprise Park Newtown, Powys SY16 4LE / GB | 02 /
Watkin, Richard Adam c/o 66 Mochdre Enterprise Park Newtown, Powys SY16 4LE / GB | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11164281.5 | 29.04.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | GB20100007262 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201007262 | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/44] | GB20100007262 | 30.04.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383488 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383488 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/34 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
F16F15/345 (EP,GB,US);
F16F15/324 (GB);
Y10T29/49876 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klammer und Gewicht für eine Radauswuchtanordnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Radauswuchtanordnung | [2011/44] | English: | A clip and a weight for a wheel balance assembly and a method of manufacture of a wheel balance assembly | [2011/44] | French: | Pince et poids pour ensemble d'équilibrage de roue et procédé de fabrication d'un ensemble d'équilibrage de roue | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11166595 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XI]JP2001248690 (NAKAMURA KOUJIROU); | [A]JP2001248691 (NAKAMURA KOUJIROU); | [AD]DE102006039485 (DIONYS HOFMANN GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE102006039485 | GB2442715 | WO2009GB00778 | WO2009GB01092 |