EP2388382 - Mounting rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heudorfer, Markus / Brunnenstrasse 2 9470, Buchs / CH | 02 /
Pol, Frédéric / Schiessstätte 12 6800, Feldkirch / AT | 03 /
Birnbaum, Ulrich / Buigenweg 4 86929, Epfenhausen / DE | 04 /
Basche, Holger / Tannenfeldstrasse 32 6812, Meiningen / AT | 05 /
Novokshanov, Denis / Wuer 4 9470, Buchs / CH | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/47] | Application number, filing date | 11164325.0 | 29.04.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | DE20101029213 | 21.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010029213 | [2011/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388382 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388382 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/41, B21D28/24, C23C2/06, C23C2/26 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
E04B1/4107 (EP,US);
B21D28/24 (EP,US);
C23C2/06 (EP,US);
C23C2/26 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49885 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | E04B1/41 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Montageschiene | [2011/47] | English: | Mounting rail | [2011/47] | French: | Rail de montage | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1988124 (ROSS JOHNSON JAMES) [X] 1-6,8-12,15 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 56; figures 1,6 * [I] 7,13,14; | [X]GB1013217 (PETER MEIER) [X] 1-6,8,15 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 129; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3531998 (HALFENEISEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 6,7* column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US5320013 (NONAMI MITSUHARU [JP], et al) [A] 13 * column 4, line 65 - column 6, line 20; figures 1,6a-6d *; | [A]DE19625233 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [A] 14 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 61; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE10125970 |