Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
25.11.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.05.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.10.2012 | Change - representative | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
19.06.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
18.05.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
16.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant |