Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012146960 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW99224173 | 14.12.2010 | TW99220036 | 18.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3170811U | Global Dossier | 29.09.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | TW100211969 | 30.06.2011 | TW99220036 | 18.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN202150092U | 22.02.2012 | U | Priority number | Date | TW100211969 | 30.06.2011 | TW99220036 | 18.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWM406215U | 21.06.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | TW99224173 | 14.12.2010 | TW99220036 | 18.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWM422107U | 01.02.2012 | U | Priority number | Date | TW100211969 | 30.06.2011 | TW99220036 | 18.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3169005U | Global Dossier | 07.07.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | TW99224173 | 14.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2466424 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW99224173 | 14.12.2010 |