EP2371822 - Heterobicyclic carboxamides as inhibitors for kinases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bold, Guido Bleumatthöhe 16 5073, Gipf-Oberfrick / CH | 02 /
Vaupel, Andrea Rütiring 23 4125, Riehen / CH | 03 /
Pissot Soldermann, Carole Novartis Pharma AG Werk Klybeck Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 04 /
Manley, Paul W. Bruggweg 12 4144, Arlesheim / CH | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11164493.6 | 13.03.2007 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | GB20060005120 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0605120 | [2011/40] | Previously filed application, date | WO2007EP02213 | 13.03.2007 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371822 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/30, C07D239/34, C07D239/36, C07D239/42, C07D239/46, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D403/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D471/06, A61K31/495, A61P35/00, C07D239/47 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/30 (KR);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C07D239/36 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D239/47 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/40] | Title | German: | Heterobicyclische Carboxamide als Kinasehemmer | [2011/40] | English: | Heterobicyclic carboxamides as inhibitors for kinases | [2011/40] | French: | Carboxamides hétérobicycliques en tant qu'inhibiteurs de kinases | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 06.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/41] | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07723223.9 / EP1996558 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070723223) is 26.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005070891 (AMGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-10,12,14-19 * Ex. 148-155,222-228,363-376,380-396,398-403,504-507,509-515,663,665-681 * [A] 11,13; | [A]WO2005021553 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2006059234 | WO03099771 | WO2005051366 | US4659516 | US4636505 | US4100274 | US5843901 | WO9917804 | US5010099 | WO9810121 | US6194181 | WO9825929 | WO9808849 | WO9943653 | WO9822461 | WO0031247 | WO0222577 | WO02092599 | US5093330 | WO0009495 | WO9702266 | EP0564409 | WO9903854 | EP0520722 | EP0566226 | EP0787722 | EP0837063 | US5747498 | WO9810767 | WO9730034 | WO9749688 | WO9738983 | WO9630347 | WO9633980 | WO9503283 | WO03013541 | EP1375482 | WO03045925 | WO0245652 | - GEISSLER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 4492 - 4498 | - BHAT ET AL., J.BIOL.CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 16170 - 16175 | - BAZZONI ET AL., J. CLIN INVEST., (1996), vol. 98, pages 521 - 8 | - ZHAO ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, pages 4687 - 9 | - GOLUB T.R. ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 307 - 316 | - O'BRIEN J. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 267, pages 5421 - 5426 | - SHIBUYA ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1990), vol. 5, pages 519 - 24 | - PARAST ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, no. 47, pages 16788 - 801 | - The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1981), vol. 3 | - Methoden der organischen Chemie, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1974), vol. 15/1 | - W.L. CODY ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 13, page 59 | - TET. LEFT., (2002), vol. 43, page 6987 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 2994 - 3008 | - BARNES, RODERICK A. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 75, page 975 | WO2005IB04030 |