EP2384973 - Systems and methods for adjusting landing gear alert envelope for offshore platforms and building-top landings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishihara, Yasuo Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Steve Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Ostrom, Gary Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2016/21] |
Former [2011/45] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11164685.7 | 03.05.2011 | [2011/45] | Priority number, date | US20100332527P | 07.05.2010 Original published format: US 332527 P | US20100821536 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: US 821536 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2384973 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2384973 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2384973 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64D45/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B64D45/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/45] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Einstellung des Fahrwerkwarnungsbereichs für Landungen auf Offshore-Plattformen und Gebäuden | [2011/45] | English: | Systems and methods for adjusting landing gear alert envelope for offshore platforms and building-top landings | [2011/45] | French: | Systèmes et procédés d'ajustement d'enveloppe d'alerte de train d'atterrissage pour atterrissages sur des plateformes en mer et toits de bâtiments | [2011/45] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.05.2011 | AL | 25.05.2016 | AT | 25.05.2016 | BE | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IT | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | IS | 25.09.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 25.05.2016 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4980684 (PATERSON NOEL S [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 17 - column 5, line 57; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5666110 (PATERSON NOEL S [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 8, line 53; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO0190694 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1* page 5, line 18 - page 20, line 25; figures 1-21 *; | [A]US2002099478 (ISHIHARA YASUO [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 0018 - page 4, paragraph 0035; figures 1-9 * |