EP2363419 - Polymer product formed using raft agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Sydney . Sydney New South Wales 2006 / AU | [2018/46] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states The University of Sydney . Sydney New South Wales 2006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawkett, Brian Stanley 1 Jedda Place Mona Vale, New South Wales 2103 / AU | 02 /
Such, Christopher Henry 50 Old Mornington Road Mount Eliza, Victoria 3930 / AU | 03 /
Nguyen, Duc Ngoc 1/61 Cornelia Street Wiley Park, New South Wales 2195 / AU | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/36] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11164980.2 | 03.04.2007 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | AU20060901730 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: AU 2006901730 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2363419 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2363419 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/38, C09C3/10, B82Y30/00, C09C1/36, C08F220/06, C08F220/14, C08F220/18, C08F230/08, C09B67/08, C09C1/24 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C08F2/38 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08F2/00 (KR);
C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C08F220/14 (EP,US);
C09B67/0008 (EP,US);
C09C1/24 (EP,US);
C09C1/3676 (EP,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,BR,KR,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C08F220/1804 (EP,BR,US);
C08F2438/03 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | C08F2/38, C09C3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2011/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polymerisationsprodukt unter Verwendung eines RAFT-Agents | [2011/36] | English: | Polymer product formed using raft agent | [2011/36] | French: | Polymère formé à l'aide d'un agent RAFT | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07718684.9 / EP2001911 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070718684) is 27.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2007 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MT | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | IE | 03.04.2019 | LU | 03.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.04.2007 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 03.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 03.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0192359 (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO03055919 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al); | [X]US2003199653 (MCCORMICK CHARLES L [US], et al); | by applicant | WO9801478 |