EP2357184 - Imidazoquinoxaline compounds as immunomodulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sutton, James Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 02 /
Xu, Feng Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 03 /
Valiante, Nicholas Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 04 /
Lan, Jiong Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | [2015/09] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
Sutton, James Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | ||
02 /
Xu, Feng Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | |||
03 /
Valiante, Nicholas Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | |||
04 /
Lan, Jiong Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | Representative(s) | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/09] |
Former [2011/33] | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11164995.0 | 23.03.2007 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | US20060785545P | 23.03.2006 Original published format: US 785545 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357184 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2357184 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07H7/06, A61K31/4985, A61P37/00 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (US);
A61K39/21 (US);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | Imidazochinoxalinverbindungen als Immunmodulatoren | [2011/33] | English: | Imidazoquinoxaline compounds as immunomodulators | [2011/33] | French: | Composés d'imidazoquinoxaline en tant qu'immunomodulateurs | [2011/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07759315.0 / EP2010537 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070759315) is 04.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 19.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2007 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | IE | 23.03.2015 | LU | 23.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | PT | 25.06.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.03.2007 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
PT | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9719079 (FOSCAMA BIOMED CHIM FARMA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * pages 14-15; example 2 * * claims 1,2,4-8 *; | [A]WO9909845 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-44 ** page 1, lines 10-14 *; | [YD]US6083505 (MILLER RICHARD L [US], et al) [YD] 1-14 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 21 * * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]US2003022898 (BURKE JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 30 * * page 30; example 12 * * page 31; example 16 * * claims 1-50 *; | [X] - CECCARELLI S ET AL, "Imidazo[1,2-a]quinoxalin-4-amines: A novel class of nonxanthine A1-adenosine receptor antagonists", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 33, no. 12, ISSN 0223-5234, (199812), pages 943 - 955, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, XP004160900 [X] 1-4,9 * page 947; table II; compound 19 * * page 943, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(99)80019-1 | [X] - DELEUZE-MASQUEFA, CARINE ET AL, "Design and synthesis of novel imidazo[1,2-a]quinoxalines as PDE4 inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 12(5), 1129-1139 CODEN: BMECEP; ISSN: 0968-0896, (2004), BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 12(5), 1129-1139 CODEN: BMECEP; ISSN: 0968-0896, XP002440985 [X] 1-4,9 * page 1132; table 1; compound 7B * * page 1129, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2003.11.034 | by applicant | EP0109942 | US4689338 | US4806352 | US4929624 | EP0372501 | EP0378881 | WO9014837 | WO9102062 | US5011828 | EP0427347 | US5026543 | US5026546 | US5057540 | EP0471177 | EP0477508 | US5238944 | WO9318150 | WO9317712 | WO9319780 | US5266575 | US5268376 | WO9400153 | US5306492 | US5346905 | WO9421292 | US5352784 | US5360897 | EP0626169 | US5378814 | US5389640 | US5395937 | WO9517210 | WO9517211 | EP0689454 | US5482936 | US5494916 | WO9611711 | US5525612 | WO9626741 | WO9629412 | WO9630514 | EP0735898 | WO9633739 | EP0761231 | US5658731 | WO9737026 | WO9743303 | US5693522 | WO9804702 | EP0835318 | WO9818931 | WO9818930 | WO9840100 | WO9842375 | WO9842721 | US5846538 | WO9857659 | WO9858668 | US5869445 | WO9911241 | WO9924578 | WO9927105 | WO9927960 | WO9928475 | WO9929693 | US5916588 | WO9936544 | WO9952549 | WO9953310 | WO9957280 | WO9958562 | WO9962923 | US6015567 | WO0007621 | WO0022430 | WO0023105 | WO0027994 | WO0037494 | US6083505 | US6090406 | US6110929 | WO0056360 | WO0067161 | WO0108636 | US6207646 | WO0121207 | WO0121152 | US6239116 | WO0137869 | WO0152885 | US6284772 | US6299884 | WO0195935 | US6333164 | WO0202606 | US2002007173 | WO0218383 | WO0218595 | WO0226757 | WO0234771 | US6429199 | US6440992 | US6451325 | WO02079243 | WO02085905 | WO02094851 | WO03002065 | WO03011223 | WO03024480 | WO03024481 | WO03035836 | WO03043572 | WO03049762 | US6605617 | WO03068811 | US6627640 | US6630161 | WO03082272 | WO03093306 | WO03097641 | US6656938 | US6660735 | US6660747 | US6664260 | US6664264 | US6664265 | US6667312 | US6670372 | US6677347 | US6677348 | US6677349 | WO2004005473 | US6683088 | US6699703 | WO2004018455 | US6703402 | WO2004041157 | US6743920 | US6756361 | WO2004060308 | WO2004064759 | WO2004064715 | WO2004071459 | WO2004076677 | US6800624 | US6800744 | WO2004087153 | US6809203 | WO2004092360 | WO2005002619 | WO2005025614 | US2005070556 | WO2005032582 | US6888000 | US6924293 | US6924271 | US2005215517 | - "Current Status of Immunological Adjuvants", ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 4, pages 369 - 388 | - DEREK T O'HAGAN, NICHOLAS M. VALIANTE, RECENT ADVANCES IN VACCINE ADJUVANTS AND DELIVERY SYSTEMS | - MATTSON, CHAN, SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 301, no. 1 1, pages 847 - 9 | - PODDA, "The adjuvanted influenza vaccines with novel adjuvants: experience with the MF59-adjuvanted vaccine", VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2673 - 2680 | - FREY ET AL., "Comparison of the safety, tolerability, and immunogenicity of a MF59-adjuvanted influenza vaccine and a non- adjuvanted influenza vaccine in non-elderly adults", VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 4234 - 4237 | - "MF59 -- Design and Evaluation of a Safe and Potent Adjuvant for Human Vaccines", OTT ET AL., Vaccine Design: The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach, PLENUM PRESS, (1995), pages 277 - 296 | - PODDA, DEL GIUDICE, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 197 - 203 | - PODDA, VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2673 - 2680 | - "Methods in Molecular Medicine series", O'HAGAN, Vaccine Adjuvants: Preparation Methods and Research Protocols, vol. 42 | - ALLISON, BYARS, RES IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 143, pages 519 - 25 | - HARIHARAN ET AL., CANCER RES, (1995), vol. 55, pages 3486 - 9 | - BARR ET AL., "ISCOMs and other saponin based adjuvants", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 32, pages 247 - 271 | - SJOLANDER ET AL., "Uptake and adjuvant activity of orally delivered saponin and ISCOM vaccines", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 32, pages 321 - 338 | - NIIKURA ET AL., "Chimeric Recombinant Hepatitis E Virus-Like Particles as an Oral Vaccine Vehicle Presenting Foreign Epitopes", VIROLOGY, (2002), vol. 293, pages 273 - 280 | - LENZ ET AL., "Papillomarivurs-Like Particles Induce Acute Activation of Dendritic Cells", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), pages 5246 - 5355 | - PINTO ET AL., "Cellular Immune Responses to Human Papillomavirus (HPV)-16 L Healthy Volunteers Immunized with Recombinant HPV-16 L Virus-Like Particles", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (2003), vol. 188, pages 327 - 338 | - GERBER ET AL., "Human Papillomavirus Virus-Like Particles Are Efficient Oral Immunogens when Coadministered with Escherichia coli Heat-Labile Entertoxin Mutant R192G or CpG", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 75, no. 10, pages 4752 - 4760 | - GLUCK ET AL., "New Technology Platforms in the Development of Vaccines for the Future", VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages B10 - B16 | - MISCHLER, METCALFE, VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, no. 5, pages B17 - 23 | - JOHNSON ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (1999), vol. 9, pages 2273 - 2278 | - THOMPSON ET AL., J LEUKOC BIOL, (2005), page 78 | - MERALDI ET AL., "OM-174, a New Adjuvant with a Potential for Human Use, Induces a Protective Response with Administered with the Synthetic C-Terminal Fragment 242-310 from the circumsporozoite protein of Plasmodium berghei", VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 2485 - 2491 | - PAJAK ET AL., "The Adjuvant OM-174 induces both the migration and maturation of murine dendritic cells in vivo", VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 836 - 842 | - KANDIMALLA ET AL., "Divergent synthetic nucleotide motif recognition pattern: design and development of potent immunomodulatory oligodeoxyribonucleotide agents with distinct cytokine induction profiles", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 2393 - 2400 | - KRIEG, "CpG motifs: the active ingredient in bacterial extracts?", NATURE MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 831 - 835 | - MCCLUSKIE ET AL., "Parenteral and mucosal prime-boost immunization strategies in mice with hepatitis B surface antigen and CpG DNA", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 32, pages 179 - 185 | - KANDIMALLA ET AL., "Toll-like receptor 9: modulation of recognition and cytokine induction by novel synthetic CpG DNAs", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (2003), vol. 31, pages 654 - 658 | - BLACKWELL ET AL., "CpG-A-Induced Monocyte IFN-gamma-Inducible Protein-10 Production is Regulated by Plasmacytoid Dendritic Cell Derived IFN-alpha", J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, no. 8, pages 4061 - 4068 | - KRIEG, "From A to Z on CpG", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 64 - 65 | - KANDIMALLA ET AL., "Secondary structures in CpG oligonucleotides affect immunostimulatory activity", BBRC, (2003), vol. 306, pages 948 - 953 | - KANDIMALLA ET AL., "Toll-like receptor 9: modulation of recognition and cytokine induction by novel synthetic GpG DNAs", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (2003), vol. 31, pages 664 - 658 | - BHAGAT ET AL., "CpG penta- and hexadeoxyribonucleotides as potent immunomodulatory agents", BBRC, (2003), vol. 300, pages 853 - 861 | - BEIGNON ET AL., "The LTR72 Mutant of Heat-Labile Enterotoxin of Escherichia coli Enhances the Ability of Peptide Antigens to Elicit CD4+ T Cells and Secrete Gamma Interferon after Coapplication onto Bare Skin", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2002), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 3012 - 3019 | - PIZZA ET AL., "Mucosal vaccines: non toxic derivatives of LT and CT as mucosal adjuvants", VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2534 - 2541 | - PIZZA ET AL., "LTK63 and LTR72, two mucosal adjuvants ready for clinical trials", INT. J. MED. MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 290, no. 4-5, pages 455 - 461 | - SCHARTON-KERSTEN ET AL., "Transcutaneous Immunization with Bacterial ADP-Ribosylating Exotoxins, Subunits and Unrelated Adjuvants", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2000), vol. 68, no. 9, pages 5306 - 5313 | - RYAN ET AL., "Mutants of Escherichia coli Heat-Labile Toxin Act as Effective Mucosal Adjuvants for Nasal Delivery of an Acellular Pertussis Vaccine: Differential Effects of the Nontoxic AB Complex and Enzyme Activity on Thl and Th2 Cells", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 67, no. 12, pages 6270 - 6280 | - PARTIDOS ET AL., "Heat-labile enterotoxin of Escherichia coli and its site-directed mutant LTK63 enhance the proliferative and cytotoxic T-cell responses to intranasally co-immunized synthetic peptides", IMMUNOL. LETT., (1999), vol. 67, no. 3, pages 209 - 216 | - PEPPOLONI ET AL., "Mutants of the Escherichia coli heat-labile enterotoxin as safe and strong adjuvants for intranasal delivery of vaccines", VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 285 - 293 | - PINE ET AL., "Intranasal immunization with influenza vaccine and a detoxified mutant of heat labile enterotoxin from Escherichia coli (LTK63", J. CONTROL RELEASE, (2002), vol. 85, no. 1-3, pages 263 - 270 | - DOMENIGHINI ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL, (1995), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 1165 - 1167 | - SINGH ET AL., J. CONT. RELE., (2001), vol. 70, pages 267 - 276 | - ANDRIANOV ET AL., "Preparation of hydrogel microspheres by coacervation of aqueous polyphophazene solutions", BIOMATERIALS, (1998), vol. 19, no. 1-3, pages 109 - 115 | - PAYNE ET AL., "Protein Release from Polyphosphazene Matrices", ADV. DRUG. DELIVERY REVIEW, (1998), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 185 - 196 | - STANLEY, "Imiquimod and the imidazoquinolines: mechanism of action and therapeutic potential", CLIN EXP DERMATOL, (2002), vol. 27, no. 7, pages 571 - 577 | - JONES, "Resiquimod 3M", CURR OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2003), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 214 - 218 | - WU ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RES., (2004), vol. 64, no. 2, pages 79 - 83 | - VASILAKOS ET AL., CELL IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 204, no. 1, pages 64 - 74 | - SIGNORELLI, HADDEN, INT IMMUNOPHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 3, no. 8, pages 1177 - 86 | - COOPER, PHARM BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 6, pages 559 - 80 | - SABROE ET AL., JL, (2003), pages 1630 - 5 | - WONG ET AL., J CLIN PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 735 - 42 | - EVANS ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 219 - 229 | - THOMPSON ET AL., METHODS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 94, pages 255 - 266 | - DALE, VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 193 - 200 | - DALE, VACCINE, vol. 14, no. 10, pages 944 - 948 | - INFECT IMMUN., (20010506), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 3510 - 3515 | - ZHU ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 660 - 669 | - PRICE ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2004), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 277 - 283 | - PLANTE ET AL., J INFECTIOUS DISEASE, (2000), vol. 182, pages 848 - 855 | - INFECT LMMUN, (20030107), vol. 1, no. 11, pages 374 - 383 | - INFECT IMMUN., (199910), vol. 67, no. 10, page 5395 | - INFECT IMMUN., (199711), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4476 - 4482 | - INFECT IMMUN., (200410), vol. 72, no. 10, page 6148 | - PROC NATL ACAD SCI US A, (20040824), vol. 101, no. 34, page 12652 | - INFECT IMMUN., (200407), vol. 72, no. 7, page 3829 | - BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (20041101), vol. 1702, no. 2, page 145 | - J AUTOIMMUN., (198906), vol. 2, page 81 | - INFECT LMMUN., (200310), vol. 71, no. 10, pages 5498 - 504 | - INFECT IMMUN, (200105), vol. 69, no. 5, pages 3323 - 3334 | - J CLIN MICROBIOL, (199912), vol. 37, no. 12, page 3997 | - CAN JBIOCHEM CELL BIOL., (198405), vol. 62, no. 5, pages 270 - 5 | - HSU ET AL., CLIN LIVER DIS, (1999), vol. 3, pages 901 - 915 | - HOUGHTON ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1991), vol. 14, page 381 | - MOINGEON P, "Cancer vaccines", VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 1305 - 1326 | - ROSENBERG SA, "Progress in human tumor immunology and immunotherapy", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 380 - 384 | - DERMINE, S. ET AL., "Cancer Vaccines and Immunotherapy", BRITISH MEDICAL BULLETIN, (2002), vol. 62, pages 149 - 162 | - ESPINOZA-DELGADO I., "Cancer Vaccines", THE ONCOLOGIST, (2002), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 20 - 33 | - DAVIS, I.D. ET AL., "Rational approaches to human cancer immunotherapy", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 23, pages 3 - 29 | - VAN DEN EYNDE B ET AL., "New tumor antigens recognized by T cells", CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 7, pages 674 - 81 | - ROSENBERG SA, "Cancer vaccines based on the identification of genes encoding cancer regression antigens", IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1997), vol. 18, pages 175 - 82 | - OFFRINGA R ET AL., "Design and evaluation of antigen-specific vaccination strategies against cancer", CURRENT OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 2, pages 576 - 582 | - ROSENBERG SA, "A new era for cancer immunotherapy based on the genes that encode cancer antigens", IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 281 - 7 | - SAHIN U ET AL., "Serological identification of human tumor antigens", CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 9, pages 709 - 16 | - OLD LJ ET AL., "New paths in human cancer serology", J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 187, pages 1163 - 7 | - CHAUX P ET AL., "Identification of MAGE-3 epitopes presented by HLA-DR molecules to CD4(+) T lymphocytes", J. EXP. MED., (1999), vol. 189, pages 767 - 78 | - GOLD P ET AL., "Specific carcinoembryonic antigens of the human digestive system", J. EXP. MED., (1965), vol. 122, pages 467 - 8 | - LIVINGSTON PO ET AL., "Carbohydrate vaccines that induce antibodies against cancer: Rationale", CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1997), vol. 45, pages 1 - 6 | - LIVINGSTON PO ET AL., "Carbohydrate vaccines that induce antibodies against cancer: Previous experience and future plans", CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1997), vol. 45, pages 10 - 9 | - TAYLOR-PAPADIMITRIOU J, "Biology, biochemistry and immunology of carcinoma- associated mucins", IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1997), vol. 18, pages 105 - 7 | - ZHAO X-J ET AL., "GD2 oligosaccharide: target for cytotoxic T lymphocytes", J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 182, pages 67 - 74 | - THEOBALD M ET AL., "Targeting p53 as a general tumor antigen", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 11993 - 7 | - GAUDERNACK G, "T cell responses against mutant ras: a basis for novel cancer vaccines", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 2, pages 3 - 9 | - PRESCOTT, Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1976), vol. XIV, page 33 | - LEE, DIFFUSION-CONTROLLED MATRIX SYSTEMS, pages 155 - 198 | - RON, LANGER, ERODIBLE SYSTEMS, pages 199 - 224 | - TETTELIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1809 - 1815 | - PIZZA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1816 - 1820 | - BJUNE ET AL., LANCET, (1991), vol. 338 | - FUSKASAWA ET AL., VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 2951 - 2958 | - ROSENQIST ET AL., DEV. BIOL. STRAND, (1998), vol. 92, pages 323 - 333 | - CONSTANTINO ET AL., VACCINE, (1992), vol. 10, pages 691 - 698 | - CONSTANTINO ET AL., VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 1251 - 1263 | - WATSON, PEDIATR INFECT DIS J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 331 - 332 | - RUBIN, PEDIATR CLIN NORTH AM, (2000), vol. 47, pages 269 - 285 | - JEDRZEJAS, MICROBIOL MOL BIOL REV, (2001), vol. 65, pages 187 - 207 | - KALMAN ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1999), vol. 21, pages 385 - 389 | - READ ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2000), vol. 28, pages 1397 - 406 | - SHIRAI ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS, (2000), vol. 181, no. 3, pages S524 - S527 | - BELL, PEDIATR INFECT DIS J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 1187 - 1188 | - IWARSON, APMIS, (1995), vol. 103, pages 321 - 326 | - GERLICH ET AL., VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, pages 63 - 68,79-80 | - GASTOFSSON ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1996), vol. 334, pages 349 - 355 | - RAPPUOLI ET AL., TIBTECH, (1991), vol. 9, pages 232 - 238 | - DEL GUIDICE ET AL., MOLECULAR ASPECTS OF MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 19, pages 1 - 70 | - ROSS ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 135 - 142 | - SUTTER ET AL., PEDIATR CLIN NORTH AM, (2000), vol. 47, pages 287 - 308 | - ZIMMERMAN, SPANN, AM FAN PHYSICIAN, (1999), vol. 59, pages 113 - 118,125-126 | - DREENSEN, VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 2 - 6 | - MMWR MORB MORTAL WKLY REP, (19980116), vol. 47, no. 1, page 12,9 | - MCMICHAEL, VACCINE, (2000), vol. L9, no. 1, pages 101 - 107 | - SCHUCHAT, LANCER, (1999), vol. 353, no. 9146, pages 51 - 6 | - DALE, INFECT DISCLIN NORTH AM, (1999), vol. 13, pages 227 - 43 | - FERRETTI ET AL., PNAS USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 4658 - 4663 | - KURODA ET AL., LANCET, (2001), vol. 357, no. 9264, pages 1225 - 1240,1218-1219 | - RAMSAY ET AL., LANCET, (2001), vol. 357, no. 9251, pages 195 - 196 | - LINDBERG, VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 28 - 36 | - BUTTERY, MOXON, J R COIL PHYSICIANS LONG, (2000), vol. 34, pages 163 - 168 | - AHMAD, CHAPNICK, INFECT DIS CLIN NORTH AM, (1999), vol. 13, pages 113 - 133 | - GOLDBLATT, J. MED. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 47, pages 663 - 567 | - CRUSE ET AL, Conjugate Vaccines, vol. 10, pages 48 - 114 | - MACKAY, B., POCKET PETS, ANIMAL ISSUES, (2001), vol. 32, no. 1 | - T. HIGUCHI, V. STELLA, Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, A.C.S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14 | - STEPHANIE PARRA, "Imidazo[1,2-a]quinoxalines: synthesis and cyclic nucleotide phosphodiesterase inhibitory activity.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 36, pages 255 - 264 | - CHUN-HE LIU, "Design, synthesis and biological evaluation of novel 4-alkylamino-1-hydroxymethylimidazo[1,2-a]quinoxalines as adenosine Al receptor antagonists.", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 12, pages 4701 - 4707 | - CARINE DELEUZE-MASQUEFA, "Design and synthesis of novel imidazo[1,2-a]quinoxaolines as PDE4 inhibitors.", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 12, pages 1129 - 1139 | - N. SATO., "Product class 14: pyrazines.", SCIENCE OF SYNTHESIS, (2004), vol. 16, pages 751 - 844 | - JIRO ADACHI, NOBUHIRO SATO, "Pyrazines. 1. Syntheses of 2,3-dihydroxypyrazines and their derivatives.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 221 - 5 | - GEO KARMAS., PAUL E, SPOERRI, "Displacements and nuclear substitutions on hydroxypyrazines.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1956), vol. 78, pages 4071 - 7 | - JIRO TSUJI, Palladium Reagents and Catalysts: Innovations in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. | - CARINE DELEUZE-MASQUEFA, GREGORI GEREBTZOFF, GUY SUBRA, JEAN-ROCH FABREGUETTES, ANNABEL OVENS, MAELLE CARRAZ, MARIE-PAULE STRUB, J, "Design and synthesis of novel imidazo[1,2-a]quinoxalines as PDE4 inhibitor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 1129 - 1139 | - CHUN-HE LIU, BO WANG, WEI-ZHANG LI, LIU-HONG YUN, YING LIU, RUI-BING SU, JIN LI, HE LIU, "Design, synthesis, and biological evaluation of novel 4-alkylamino-1-hydroxymethylimidazo[1,2-a]quinoxalines as adenosine A1 receptor antagonist", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 12, no. 17, pages 4701 - 4707 | - POPE ET AL., CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 162, pages 333 - 339 | - RAZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 9519 - 9523 | - PHARM RES., (200412), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 2148 - 52 | US20000581772 | GB20010005640 | US20030405495 | US20030748071 | US20040762873 | US20040814480 | WO2005US22769 | WO2005US22520 | WO2005US32721 |