EP2521247 - Electric corona shielding system for a high voltage machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brockschmidt, Mario Wusthoffstraße 1 45131, Essen / DE | 02 /
Kempen, Stefan Feldgarten 29 44388, Dortmund / DE | 03 /
Pohlmann, Friedhelm Schloßstraße 86 45355, Essen / DE | 04 /
Schmidt, Guido Fasanenstr. 25b 42799, Leichlingen / DE | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 11165111.3 | 06.05.2011 | [2012/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521247 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/30, H02K3/40 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H02K3/40 (EP);
H02K3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrisches Glimmschutzsystem für eine Hochspannungsmaschine | [2012/45] | English: | Electric corona shielding system for a high voltage machine | [2012/45] | French: | Système de protection anti-rougoiement électrique pour une machine haute tension | [2012/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102009039457 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7,11-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0033] * * claims 1, 4 * * figure 1 * [I] 2,4,6,8-10; | [A]EP0740404 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 2,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - line 10 * * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 5 *; | [A]US2007087116 (GOETTER RONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * claim 1 * |