EP2385658 - Interactive media content delivery using a separate backchannel communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
Former [2015/37] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westberg, Thomas E. 553 Sudbury Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | 02 /
Bovenschulte, David 708 Blue Hill Road River Vale, NJ 07675 / US | 03 /
Fereira, Edgar A. 17 Maryanne Lane Stamford, 06905 / US | [2018/16] |
Former [2011/45] | 01 /
Westberg, Thomas E. 553 Sudbury Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | ||
02 /
Bovenschulte, David 708 Blue Hill Road River Vale, NJ 07675 / US | |||
03 /
Ferreira, Edgar A. 17 Maryanne Lane Stamford, 06905 / US | Representative(s) | Pisani, Diana Jean Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Pisani, Diana Jean Haley Guiliano International LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | ||
Former [2014/20] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11165209.5 | 11.04.2007 | [2011/45] | Priority number, date | US20060403714 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: US 403714 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2385658 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2385658 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2385658 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2385658 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L29/06, H04N7/173, H04N5/76, H04N5/445, H04N21/472, H04N21/436, H04N21/6377, H04N21/61, H04N21/443, H04N21/2668, H04N21/4722, H04N21/6587, H04N21/482 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04L12/2801 (EP,US);
H04L12/2812 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/6118 (EP,US);
H04N21/6175 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/6587 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | H04L12/28, H04L29/06, H04N7/173, H04N5/76, H04N5/445, H04N21/472, H04N21/436, H04N21/6377, H04N21/61, H04N21/443, H04N21/2668, H04N21/4722, H04N21/6587 | ||
Former IPC [2011/45] | H04L12/28, H04L29/06, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2011/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lieferung interaktiver Medieninhalte über ein separates Rückkanal-Kommunikationsnetzwerk | [2011/45] | English: | Interactive media content delivery using a separate backchannel communications network | [2011/45] | French: | Fourniture de contenu de média interactif utilisant un réseau séparé de communication de canal de retour | [2011/45] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 21.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07775225.1 / EP2008408 | Divisional application(s) | EP14163271.1 / EP2793430 | EP18152647.6 Application refused : 03.07.2018 | EP18172739.7 / EP3410643 | EP24150125.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070775225) is 27.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2015
18.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Virgin Media Limited Media House Bartley Wood Business Park Hook Hampshire RG27 9UP / GB Opponent's representative Martin, Philip John Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [2016/42] |
Former [2015/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2015
18.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Virgin Media Limited Media House Bartley Wood Business Park Hook Hampshire RG27 9UP / GB Opponent's representative Gwilt, Julia Louise Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | 20.03.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.09.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.04.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.03.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2007 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | IE | 11.04.2015 | LU | 11.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003002638 (KAARS PETER BERNHARD [US]); | [I]WO03021828 (PUBLIGROUPE SA [CH], et al); | [A]US2004117857 (BISDIKIAN CHATSCHIK [US], et al); | [A]WO2005025194 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al); | [I]WO2005041594 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]US2005114891 (WASENIUS REIDAR [FI]); | [I]WO2006010733 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [I]US2006053436 (ALLWEIN EDWARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US20060403709 |