EP2388462 - Method of operating a variable geometry turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piper, Erik L. / 603 Oak Park Boulevard Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2011/47] | Löser, Iris Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11165223.6 | 09.05.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | US20100782285 | 18.05.2010 Original published format: US 782285 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388462 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388462 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/34 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/1445 (EP,US);
F02D41/145 (EP,US);
F02M26/10 (EP,US);
F02B29/0406 (EP,US);
F02B37/24 (EP,US);
F02D2250/38 (EP,US);
F02D41/0065 (EP,US);
F02D41/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2011/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Turbine mit variabler Geometrie | [2011/47] | English: | Method of operating a variable geometry turbine | [2011/47] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'une turbine à géométrie variable | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 29.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 03.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1302644 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020]; claims 1-8 *; | [A]JP2005299600 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YA]DE102004051837 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2-5,7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 41] - paragraph [0045]; figure 11 * [A] 1,6,8,9; | [A]FR2885388 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 6 *; | [A]FR2905408 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 10 - page 13; figures 1-4 *; | [IY]WO2008140393 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE], et al) [I] 1,6,8,9 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 5; claim 3 * [Y] 2-5,7; | [A]US2009094009 (MULLER MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0076]; figures 2-4; claim 10 *; | [A] - HEYWOOD J B ED - HEYWOOD J B, INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE FUNDAMENTALS.,SUPERCHARGING AND TURBOCHARGING, INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE FUNDAMENTALS; [MCGRAW-HILL SERIES IN MECHANICAL ENGINEERING], NEW YORK, MCGRAW-HILL, US, PAGE(S) 248 - 255, (19880101), ISBN 978-0-07-100499-2, XP002662938 [A] 2-5,7 * page 255 * |