EP2523369 - Broadband base station comprising means for free space optical communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Väänänen, Mikko P.O. Box 346 00131 Helsinki / FI | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 11165821.7 | 12.05.2011 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523369 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/112, H04W88/10 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04B10/1129 (EP,US);
H04B10/112 (EP);
H04B10/1125 (EP,US);
H04B10/27 (US);
H04B10/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/46] | H04B10/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Breitbandbasisstation mit Vorrichtung zur optischen Freiraum-Kommunikation | [2012/46] | English: | Broadband base station comprising means for free space optical communications | [2012/46] | French: | Station de base comprenant des moyens pour communication optique en espace libre | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 05.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.01.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9945665 (AIR FIBER INC [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 3 * * page 6, lines 5-12 * * page 10, lines 3-17 * * page 11, lines 13-15 * * page 12, line 23 - page 14, line 10 * * page 20, lines 1-2 * * figures 2, 5, 15 *; | [I]WO03047130 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 5 *; | [I]US2002181444 (ACAMPORA ANTHONY [US]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0119] - [0121] * * figures 2, 3a, 3b *; | [I]US5493436 (KARASAWA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, lines 15-51 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9417605 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9,13,15 * page 8, lines 17-18 *; | [A]WO2011017764 (TECH RESOURCES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9,13,15 * page 8, line 37 - page 9, line 1 *; | [A]US2010260084 (IMAMURA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9,13,15 * paragraph [0050] * | by applicant | WO2006044519 | EP1476968 | EP1476968 | EP2261996 | EP2226852 | EP20080735694 | EP20080803499 |