02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
31.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.11.2018 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
30.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.10.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.09.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.08.2018 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
26.07.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.06.2018 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
29.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.12.2017 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
26.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.08.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2014 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
25.06.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.03.2014 |
First examination report |
|
04.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.09.2013 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
19.06.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.06.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
07.06.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
12.10.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |