EP2501016 - Integrated battery charger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samya Technology Co., Ltd. 18F, N°1221, Jhongiheng Road Taoyuan County Taoyuan City 330 / TW | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Fu-I SAMYA TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD 18F., No.1221, Jhongjheng Road Taoyuan County 330, Taoyuan City Chinese Taipei / TW | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11166088.2 | 13.05.2011 | [2012/38] | Priority number, date | TW20110109262 | 18.03.2011 Original published format: TW 100109262 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2501016 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2501016 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
H02J7/0024 (EP,US);
H02J7/0045 (EP,US);
H02J7/0068 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Integriertes Batterieladegerät | [2012/38] | English: | Integrated battery charger | [2012/38] | French: | Chargeur de batterie intégré | [2012/38] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB1448053 (KINDER B) [I] 1-10 * page 1, line 74 - line 83 * * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 20; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5778325 (LINDELL BO KARL [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 24 - line 43 * * column 7, line 16 - line 40; figures 1-4 *; | [I]US5811959 (KEJHA JOSEPH B [US]) [I] 1-10 * column 2, line 22 - line 36 * * column 4, line 63 - column 6, line 57; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1363379 (LUXON ENERGY DEVICES CORP [TW]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 18; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1814016 (SAMYA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-10* page 3, paragraph 11 - page 4, paragraph 22; figures 1-5,11,12 *; | [I]US2008007215 (HSIEH HSIN-PEI [TW]) [I] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 15; figures 2 - 5-2 * * page 2, paragraph 27 - page 3, paragraph 39 *; | [A]WO2008021464 (JOHNSON NELDON P [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 1; figure 1 * |