EP2388183 - Vehicle side body structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imamura, Shogo c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11166654.1 | 19.05.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | JP20100116694 | 20.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010116694 | JP20100116756 | 20.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010116756 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2388183 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2388183 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D25/20, B60J5/04, B62D25/04, B62D25/02 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
B62D25/2036 (EP,US);
B60J5/0426 (EP,US);
B60J5/0429 (EP,US);
B60J5/0444 (EP,US);
B62D21/157 (EP,US);
B62D25/025 (EP,US);
B62D25/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/22] |
Former [2011/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Seitenaufbau einer Fahrzeugkarosserie | [2011/47] | English: | Vehicle side body structure | [2011/47] | French: | Structure latérale de carrosserie de véhicule | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2000085634 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP2030872 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] *; | [AP]WO2010055589 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JP3492922B |