EP2524734 - Apparatus for performing a centrifugal field-flow fractionation comprising a seal which minimizes leakage and method of performing centrifugal field-flow fractionation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Postnova Analytics GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 14 86899 Landsberg / DE | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welz, Roland Abingdon-Straße 10 86956, Schongau / DE | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2012/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11166874.5 | 20.05.2011 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2524734 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2524734 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/04, B04B9/12, B04B11/02, G01N30/00 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
B04B5/0442 (EP,US);
B04B15/06 (US);
B04B11/02 (EP,US);
B04B9/12 (EP,US);
B04B2005/045 (EP);
G01N2030/002 (EP,US);
G01N30/0005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Durchführung einer zentrifugalen Feldflussfraktionierung mit einer Dichtung zur Minimierung der Leckage und Verfahren zur Durchführung einer zentrifugalen Feldflussfraktionierung | [2012/47] | English: | Apparatus for performing a centrifugal field-flow fractionation comprising a seal which minimizes leakage and method of performing centrifugal field-flow fractionation | [2012/47] | French: | Dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre d'un fractionnement par effet centrifuge dans un fluide en écoulement comprenant un joint pour réduire les fuites et procédé pour la mise en oeuvre d'un tel fractionnement | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 02.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2011 | AL | 14.01.2015 | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | ES | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | IT | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | RS | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | IE | 20.05.2015 | LU | 20.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PT | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 14.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3698626 (KOTRAPPA PAYASADA, et al) [A] 1,10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4375871 (ROMANAUSKAS WILLIAM A) [A] 1,10 * figure - *; | [AD]US4448679 (DILKS JR CHARLES H [US], et al) [AD] 1,10* the whole document *; | [A]US2006151403 (CARDOT PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0098]; figure 7 * | by applicant | US4448679 |