EP2439844 - Bulk acoustic wave resonator, bulk acoustic wave filter and their corresponding methods of manufacture. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/15] | Bulk acoustic wave resonator, bulk acoustic wave filter and their corresponding methods of manufacture | ||
[2013/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RichWave Technology Corp. 3F. No1, Section 2 Alley 20, Lane 407 Tiding Blvd. NeiHu District Taipei City 114 / TW | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mao, Shau-Gang 12F.- No. 12, Ln. 90, Sec. 2 Fuxing S. Rd., Da'an Dist. Taipei City 106 / TW | 02 /
Deng, Wei-Kung No.280, Aly. 228, Ln. 622, Minzu Rd., Longtan Township 325, Taoyuan County / TW | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Becker Kurig Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11167021.2 | 23.05.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | TW099134586 | 11.10.2010 Original published format: TW 099134586 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439844 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439844 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03H3/04, H03H9/13, H03H9/58, H03H9/02 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H03H9/02228 (EP,US);
H03H3/04 (EP,US);
H03H9/132 (EP,US);
H03H9/584 (EP,US);
H03H2003/0457 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Volumenschallwellenresonator, Volumenschallwellenfilter und entsprechende Verfahren zur Herstellung. | [2013/02] | English: | Bulk acoustic wave resonator, bulk acoustic wave filter and their corresponding methods of manufacture. | [2013/02] | French: | Résonateur à ondes acoustiques de volume, filtre à ondes acoustiques de volume et méthodes correspondantes pour leurs fabrications. | [2013/02] |
Former [2012/15] | Volumenschallwellenresonator, Volumenschallwellenfilter und entsprechende Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [2012/15] | Bulk acoustic wave resonator, bulk acoustic wave filter and their corresponding methods of manufacture | ||
Former [2012/15] | Résonateur à ondes acoustiques de volume, filtre à ondes acoustiques de volume et méthodes correspondantes pour leurs fabrications | Examination procedure | 10.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 03.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006126168 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 10; figures 5,6 *; | [XY]US2007176710 (JAMNEALA TIBERIU [US], et al) [X] 7-21 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0058]; figure 8 * [Y] 22-25; | [X]EP1887689 (HITACHI MEDIA ELECTRON KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US2008129416 (VOLATIER ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 7-21 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0051]; figure 5 * [Y] 22-25; | [Y]WO2010079614 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP], et al) [Y] 22-25* figures 9a,9b * |