EP2384989 - Locking latch for transport containers with collapsible side walls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFCO Systems Austria GmbH Aurachkirchen 45 4812 Pinsdorf / AT | [2011/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orgeldinger, Wolfgang Balanstrasse 89d 81539 München / DE | [2013/36] |
Former [2011/45] | 01 /
Orgeldinger, Wolfgang Balanstraße 89D 81539, München / DE | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner P.O. Box 246 82043 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11167371.1 | 28.05.2009 | [2011/45] | Priority number, date | AT20080000862 | 28.05.2008 Original published format: AT 8622008 | [2011/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2384989 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2384989 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2384989 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D6/18 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B65D11/1833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/45] | Title | German: | Verschlussriegel für Transportbehälter mit klappbaren Seitenwänden | [2011/45] | English: | Locking latch for transport containers with collapsible side walls | [2011/45] | French: | Verrou pour récipients de transport dotés de parois latérales pliantes | [2011/45] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 08.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09007108.5 / EP2128035 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090007108) is 14.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | IE | 28.05.2014 | LU | 28.05.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/33] | BG | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002347760 (GIFU PLASTIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] * * figures 13-15 *; | [A]US2003006232 (RAGHUNATHAN NARAYAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE10137328 (SCHOELLER WAVIN SYS SERV GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] ** figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2005098557 (MURAKAMI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0071] - [0083] * * figures 14a,14b * | by applicant | US7195128 | DE10137328 |