EP2529968 - A method of using fuel in transportation means for reduction of fuel consumption and carbon emission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wu, Wen-Chen 4F., No. 1, Ln 111, Nanshan Road Zhonghe District New Taipei City 235, Chinese Taipei / TW | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Horak, Michael, et al Horak. Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Georgstraße 48 30159 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Horak, Michael, et al Horak Rechtsanwälte Georgstrasse 48 30159 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 11167384.4 | 25.05.2011 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2529968 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/00, B60K15/01, F02M31/125, F02M31/18, F02G5/02 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
B60K15/00 (EP,US);
B60K15/01 (EP);
F02M31/125 (EP,US);
F02M31/18 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03427 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwendung von Kraftstoff in Transportmitteln zur Verringerung des Kraftstoffverbrauchs und der Kohlendioxidemission | [2012/49] | English: | A method of using fuel in transportation means for reduction of fuel consumption and carbon emission | [2012/49] | French: | Procédé pour utiliser du carburant dans un moyen de transport pour la réduction de la consommation de carburant et l'émission de carbone | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4325345 (WILKINSON ROBERT S, et al) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * column 5, lines 22-67 * * column 6, lines 14-25 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4713524 (LEO VINCENT B [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 32 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6330825 (HARNESS HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 50 - column 8, line 28 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [X]GB1575030 (FEUERMAN A) [X] 1,3 * page 2, lines 20-43 * * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 40 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2008314370 (WEICHE CHRISTOPHER D [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0017] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]KR100422739B (CHO JOONG WON) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US4703741 (CURRAN JEFFREY M [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 28 * * column 6, lines 4-31 * * figure . * |