EP2526766 - Nail for a horse shoe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mustad Netherlands B.V. Het Helmhout 12 9206 AZ Drachten / NL | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stelin, Carlos Sågbrovägen 1 66010 Dals Långed / SE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11167717.5 | 26.05.2011 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2526766 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01L7/10 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
A01L7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nagel für einen Pferdehuf | [2012/48] | English: | Nail for a horse shoe | [2012/48] | French: | Clou pour fer à cheval | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB190828309 (KNIGHT ALFRED WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,11 * figure 5 * [Y] 9 [I] 6; | [XI]GB740626 (PETER JOACHIM SIEGFRIED EISNER) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,11 * page 1; figures 1,2 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]GB191116261 (KNIGHT ALFRED WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,11 * figures 1,2,5 * [I] 6; | [X]IT1176359 (PETRULLI ANGELO) [X] 1-4,7,8 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9832331 (SAVE EDGE NAIL WORLDWIDE INC [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figure 3 * |