EP2383943 - Event delivery apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | Semantic information-oriented network (SION) | ||
[2014/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshiai, Takashige c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Kikuya, Yukio c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Hiroshi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Takamichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | 05 /
Takemoto, Michiharu c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | [2014/30] |
Former [2011/44] | 01 /
Hoshiai, Takashige 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Kikuya, Yukio 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Shibata, Hiroshi 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
Sakai, Takamichi 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | |||
05 /
Takemoto, Michiharu 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2011/44] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam F-75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11167933.8 | 07.03.2001 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | JP20000062447 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000062447 | JP20000204203 | 05.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000204203 | JP20000284075 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000284075 | JP20000284076 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000284076 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383943 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383943 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2383943 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/54, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, G06F17/30 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
G06F16/30 (EP,US);
H04L12/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/565 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | H04L12/56, G06F13/00, G06F17/30, H04L12/18, H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Übermittlung von Ereignissen | [2014/13] | English: | Event delivery apparatus and method | [2014/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la transmission des événements | [2014/13] |
Former [2011/44] | Auf semantischen Informationen beruhendes Netzwerk | ||
Former [2011/44] | Semantic information-oriented network (SION) | ||
Former [2011/44] | Réseau sémantique orienté informations | Examination procedure | 27.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 26.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01912149.0 / EP1267527 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010912149) is 04.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5870605 (BRACHO RAFAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - column 16, line 37 ** figures 1-5,7,8,10,12 * | by applicant | US5870605 | JPH11328654 | - Goi-Taikei - A Japanese Lexicon, NTT COMMUNICATION SCIENCE LABORATORIES, IWANAMI PUBLISHING | - Kadokawa New Thesaurus, KADOKAWA PUBLISHING | - Japanese Thesaurus "Bunrui-Goihyo", THE NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR JAPANESE LANGUAGE | - MAKOTO NAGAO, NATURAL LANGUAGE PROCESSING |