EP2397991 - Method for providing texture effect and display apparatus applying the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeoungtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Young-hoon 307, Taegeon Heights Villa 159-278, Sangdo 2-dong Dongjak-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Im, Sang-kyun 108-1203, Hagyeoul Chonggu Apt. 23/6, 354, Hagye-dong Nowon-gu, Seoul / KR | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11168587.1 | 02.06.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | KR20100057660 | 17.06.2010 Original published format: KR 20100057660 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397991 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
G06T11/001 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
H04N21/4318 (KR);
H04N9/3179 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung einer Strukturwirkung und damit versehene Anzeigevorrichtung | [2011/51] | English: | Method for providing texture effect and display apparatus applying the same | [2011/51] | French: | Procédé de fourniture d'effet de texture et appareil d'affichage l'appliquant | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0961230 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2002122043 (FREEMAN WILLIAM T [US], et al) [Y] 3,13 * abstract * * figures 1-15 * * section 3 *; | [A]US2009214110 (SON BYUNG-JUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XYI] - HERTZMANN A ET AL, "IMAGE ANALOGIES", COMPUTER GRAPHICS. SIGGRAPH 2001. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. LOS ANGELES, CA, AUG. 12 - 17, 2001; [COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS. SIGGRAPH], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20010812), ISBN 978-1-58113-374-5, pages 327 - 340, XP001049902 [X] 1,2,5,6,8-12,15 * figures 3-16 * * sections 3.3, 4.5 * * page 333, column L, paragraph 1 * [Y] 3,4,13,14 [I] 7 | [X] - YING TANG ET AL, "Natural Textures for Weather Data Visualization", INFORMATION VISUALIZATION, 2006 LONDON, ENGLAND 05-07 JULY 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060705), doi:10.1109/IV.2006.77, ISBN 978-0-7695-2602-7, pages 741 - 750, XP010927204 [X] 1,11 * figures 1,2,4 * * section 4.1.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IV.2006.77 | [X] - FANG ET AL., "Textureshop: texture synthesis as a photograph editing tool", ACM TRANS. GRAPH., NEW YORK USA, (20040101), vol. 23, no. 3, doi:http://doi.acm.org/10.1145/1015706.1015728, pages 354 - 359, XP040007767 [X] 1,11 * abstract * * figure 9 * * p. 358 section "Normal Transfer (Embossing)" * | [Y] - "2.4 Image Mosaics", Strothotte et al., Non-photorealistic Computer Graphics, USA, Morgan Kaufmann Publishers, (20020101), pages 72 - 81, ISBN 1-55860-787-0, XP002658305 [Y] 4,14 * page 74, paragraphs 2,6 * |