Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | NL | | PL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | European patent granted | 07.05.2014 | Opposition procedure | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 14.09.2011 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20110606 | | Event date: | 14.09.2011 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1959992 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 14.09.2011 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 14.09.2011 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | HR | | Event date: | 15.08.2012 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20120713 | | Event date: | 17.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 1161979 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 07.08.2013 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20130709 | | Event date: | 25.12.2013 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20131127 | | Event date: | 07.05.2014 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | HR | | Event date: | 07.05.2014 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1959992 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 07.05.2014 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 07.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 666084 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20140515 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG, CH | | Event date: | 04.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 10.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20140605 | | Event date: | 18.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602006041549 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20140618 | | Event date: | 25.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 08.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 24.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20140611 | | Event date: | 23.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2479165 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20140723 | | Event date: | 03.10.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 16685 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 30.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT | | Event date: | 15.10.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E009449 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20140710 | | Event date: | 28.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E021461 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20150210 | | Event date: | 10.02.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602006041549 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602006041549 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20150210 | | Event date: | 24.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 10.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 04.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20140401199 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20140718 | | Event date: | 17.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 20.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 06.07.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK WD 1161979 HK | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 28.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR TUEP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED | | Event date: | 14.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20181204 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 04.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR T1PR P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA | | Event date: | 27.12.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20191203 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 25.12.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20201210 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 26.03.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR PPPP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | TRANSFER OF RIGHTS | OWNER: | BIOGEN MA INC., US | | Event date: | 04.04.2014 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 29.03.2014 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 26.11.2013 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 08.07.2013 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 12.08.2011 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 13.03.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 24.12.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20211209 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 13.03.2015 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 06.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20221208 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.01.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20221122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 22.12.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20231129 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20231122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 12.12.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20241122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 16.12.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 16.12.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 09.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 10.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 03.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140484 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20241202 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 14.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20241126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 15.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20241122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20241125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 17.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20241122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 20.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 20.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20241126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 21.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 21.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20241122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Payment DATE: | 20241122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20241209 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20241122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20241122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20241127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 27.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20241127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 27.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20241203 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 29.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 03.02.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20241127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 25.02.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20241129 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 17.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20250102 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 24.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20250101 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 28.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 28.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20231121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | |