EP2394580 - Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus, ultrasonic image processing apparatus, and medical image diagnostic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Toshigi 324-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshiara, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi, 324-8550 / JP | 02 /
Kamiyama, Naohisa c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi, 324-8550 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Tetsuya c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi, 324-8550 / JP | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2011/50] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11168963.4 | 07.06.2011 | [2011/50] | Priority number, date | JP20100131421 | 08.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010131421 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394580 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394580 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61B8/08, G01S7/52 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G01S7/52071 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
G01S7/52026 (EP,US);
G01S7/52074 (EP,US);
A61B6/481 (EP,US);
A61B6/504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | Ultraschalldiagnosevorrichtung, Ultraschallbildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und medizinische Bilddiagnosevorrichtung | [2011/50] | English: | Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus, ultrasonic image processing apparatus, and medical image diagnostic apparatus | [2011/50] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic à ultrasons, appareil de traitement d'images à ultrasons et appareil d'imagerie pour le diagnostic médical | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 14.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2011 | AL | 12.12.2018 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | MT | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | RS | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | GB | 07.06.2019 | IE | 07.06.2019 | LU | 07.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | FR | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.06.2011 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
MT | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
GB | 07.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.06.2011 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
GB | 07.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
GB | 07.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
GB | 07.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
GB | 07.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
LU | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
GB | 07.06.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1884195 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,12-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0029] - [0036] - [0045]; figures 1,5-6; table 3 * [Y] 9,11,20,22 [I] 7,8,18,19,23; | [XI]JPH11137552 (YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYST) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0041] - [0045] - [0050]; figures 1,3-4,6,7,8 * [I] 23; | [IY]WO2009037484 (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1,3,5,6,12,14,16,23 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - line 18 * * page 7, line 7 - line 9 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 11 * * page 10, line 11 - line 21 * * page 10, line 22 - line 31 * * page 11, line 1 - line 14 * * page 11, line 15 - page 13, line 3 * * page 16, line 12 - line 16 * * page 18, line 10 - page 19, line 26 * * figures 1,6a,6b,7a,7b,8a,8b,9 * * claims 13-20,25 * [Y] 9,20; | [YA]WO2007054544 (BRACCO RESEARCH SA [CH], et al) [Y] 11,22 * page 11, line 20 - page 17, line 29; figures 1,2a-8b * * page 20, line 7 - page 26, line 5; figure 13 * [A] 1-10,12-21,23; | [A]WO2009083557 (BRACCO RESEARCH SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 5, line 17 - line 27 * * page 7, line 5 - page 12, line 12; figures 1,2 * * page 20, line 17 - page 25, line 3; figure 4a * * page 29, line 15 - line 25; figure 7a * * page 31, line 17 - line 26 *; | [A]EP1767961 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US]) [A] 1,12,23 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0026]; figure 1 * | [XI] - HUGHES M ET AL, "Ultrasonic molecular imaging of primordial angiogenic vessels in rabbit and mouse models with /spl alpha/v/spl beta/3 -integrin targeted nanoparticles using information-theoretic signal detection: results at high frequency and in the clinical diagnostic frequency range", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, 2005 IEEE ROTTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS 18-21 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050918), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.2005.1602928, ISBN 978-0-7803-9382-0, pages 617 - 620, XP010898816 [X] 1,10,12,21 * page 619, column left, paragraph 3 - column right, paragraph 2; figures 2,3 * [I] 23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2005.1602928 | [IA] - STOIAN A ET AL, "Information System for Tumor Angiogenesis Phenomena Imaging Monitor", AUTOMATION, QUALITY AND TESTING, ROBOTICS, 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CON FERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060501), doi:10.1109/AQTR.2006.254683, ISBN 978-1-4244-0360-8, pages 468 - 472, XP031024081 [I] 1,12,23 * page 469, column right, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6 * * page 471, column left, paragraph 2 - column right, paragraph 4; figures 5-10 * [A] 2-5,9,11,13-16,20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AQTR.2006.254683 | [A] - KASSARJIAN ARA; DUBOIS JOSÉE; BURROWS PATRICIA E, "Angiographic classification of hepatic hemangiomas in infants.", RADIOLOGY, United States, (2002), vol. 222, no. 3, pages 693 - 698, XP002661729 [A] 1-23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/radiol.2223010030 | Examination | EP2417912 | by applicant | JP2001269341 | JP2004321688 | JP2007330764 | - R.K. JAIN, "Normalization of Tumor Vasculature: An Emerging Concept in Antiangiogenetic Therapy", SCIENCE, (200501), vol. 307, doi:doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1104819, pages 58 - 62, XP002503618 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1104819 | - M. YAMAZAKI ET AL., "Sonic hedgehog derived from human pancreatic cancer cells augments angiogenic function of endothelial progenitor cells", CANCER SCIENCE, vol. 99, no. 6, pages 1131 - 1138 |