EP2532451 - Method and device for avoiding formation of friction martensite when shaving a wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2018/13] |
Former [2012/50] | For:DE
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun-Klabunde, Thomas Auf dem Strenkelrath7 41517 Grevenbroich / DE | 02 /
Plorin, Dietrich Leinenring 28 B 29462 Wustrow / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Keenway Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Heine, Christian Klaus KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | Heine, Christian Klaus KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11169138.2 | 08.06.2011 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532451 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2532451 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21C9/00, B21C43/02, B23D79/12, B23Q11/10 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B21C9/005 (EP);
B21C43/02 (EP);
B23D79/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vermeidung von Reibmartensit beim Ziehschälen eines Drahts | [2012/50] | English: | Method and device for avoiding formation of friction martensite when shaving a wire | [2012/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour éviter la formation de martensite par friction lors de l'écroûtage d'un fil métallique | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 29.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2011 | AL | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | MT | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | IE | 08.06.2018 | LU | 08.06.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP0958887 (ENSHU LIMITED [JP]) [I] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0038] , [0078] - [0079]; figure 20 * [Y] 2; | [IY]WO03022517 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [I] 1,3,4 * page 9, lines 7-12; figure 2a * [Y] 2; | [Y]DE2334041 (LASALLE STEEL CO) [Y] 2 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0412512 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 2 * page 2, lines 29-31;52-54; figure 1; claims 1-2 * | Examination | JPS62236618 |