EP2398123 - Method and safety circuit for operating a photovoltaic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ritter Elektronik GmbH Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baader, Uwe Zedernweg 94 42111 Wuppertal / DE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11169232.3 | 09.06.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | DE20101023761 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010023761 | [2011/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2398123 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2398123 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02H5/00, H01L31/02, H01L31/042, H02H7/122, H02J3/38, H02M3/158 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H01L31/02021 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H04B3/548 (EP);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | H02H5/00, H01L31/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Sicherheitsschaltung zum Betreiben einer Photovoltaikvorrichtung | [2011/51] | English: | Method and safety circuit for operating a photovoltaic device | [2011/51] | French: | Procédé et commutation de sécurité pour le fonctionnement d'un dispositif photovoltaïque | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 26.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 02.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1914857 (SMA TECHNOLOGIE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0026] , [0028] , [0029]; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2008147335 (ADEST MEIR [IL], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0080] , [0085] , [0100] , [0101]; figures 4,7,9; claim 2 *; | [Y]KR100918964B (YOUNG NAM ELECTRIC ENGINEERING [KR]) [Y] 1-10* abstract * | by applicant | DE102007048914 | DE102005018173 | DE102008052037 |