EP2532344 - Cleansing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Martin Neckarstr. 4c 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | 02 /
Olsson, Kristin Bahnhofstr. 15 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Grit, Mustafa KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 11169432.9 | 10.06.2011 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532344 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/42, A61K8/46, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61Q5/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61Q5/004 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung | [2012/50] | English: | Cleansing composition | [2012/50] | French: | Composition de nettoyage | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0559375 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * example 22 * * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 2, line 40 - page 4, line 11 *; | [XY]DE4432366 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 6 - line 38 * * page 3, line 1 - line 51 * * claim - * [Y] 1-15; | [X]US2007081953 (DAHMS GERD [DE]) [X] 1-7 * examples 1,3 *; | [X]US2004224863 (SUN JAMES ZIMING [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,12 * example 2 *; | [X]US2003172474 (LANG GERARD [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * claim 1 *; | [X]US5227086 (KACHER MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * example S; table IV *; | [Y]EP1925290 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * example - *; | [A]DE10213574 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0028] * | [Y] - LOEFFLER M, "OPTIMIERTES TENSIDKONZENTRAT ENTHALTEND BETAIN, TAURAT UND ISETHIONAT", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE, VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, AUGSBURG, DE, (20070906), vol. 133, no. 9, ISSN 0942-7694, XP001542782 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2521960 | DE2811010 | DE3044738 | DE3217059 | EP0337354 | EP0524612 | EP0640643 |