06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
09.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
09.07.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
03.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
31.07.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
09.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2017 |
First examination report |
|
27.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
15.06.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
27.03.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|