EP2397662 - Ventilation system and method for supercharged engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Filter Systems Japan Corporation 1-2 Ikebukuro 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0014 / JP | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Akihiro c/o Mahle Filter Systems Japan Corporation 1-2, Ikebukuro 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo, 171-0014 / JP | 02 /
Mochizuki, Terumoto c/o Mahle Filter Systems Japan Corporation 1-2, Ikebukuro 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo, 171-0014 / JP | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11169809.8 | 14.06.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | JP20100285450 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010285450 | JP20100137849 | 17.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010137849 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2397662 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2397662 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/00 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
F01M13/00 (EP,US);
F01M2013/0044 (EP,US);
F01M2013/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Belüftungssystem und -verfahren für Kompressormotor | [2011/51] | English: | Ventilation system and method for supercharged engine | [2011/51] | French: | Système de ventilation et procédé pour un moteur suralimenté | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2182185 (MAHLE FILTER SYSTEMS JP CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0024] - [0037]; figure - *; | [A]WO2008041113 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 8 - page 21; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009301446 (ASANUMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0030]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2009223498 (SHIEH TENGHUA TOM [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102008029904 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044]; figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2007016664 | JP2010112178 | JP2010285450 | JP2010137849 |