EP2415701 - Method for wrapping a sheet of material and roll cutting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89520 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Haag, Rolf Hörnenweg 9a 47647 Kerken / DE | 02 /
Pringal, Christian Gneisenaustr. 7 47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Klupp, Alexander Karolingerring 38 41812 Erkelenz / DE | 04 /
Begemann, Ulrich Sachsenweg 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 05 /
D'Agostino, Angelo Pirmasenser Weg 20a 40229 Düsseldorf / DE | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/06] | Application number, filing date | 11169922.9 | 15.06.2011 | [2012/06] | Priority number, date | DE20101039007 | 06.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010039007 | [2012/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2415701 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2415701 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H18/16, B65H18/20, B65H23/195 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
B65H18/20 (EP);
B65H18/16 (EP);
B65H23/1955 (EP);
B65H2301/4148 (EP);
B65H2408/236 (EP);
B65H2515/314 (EP);
B65H2557/262 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | B65H18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn und Rollenschneidvorrichtung | [2012/06] | English: | Method for wrapping a sheet of material and roll cutting device | [2012/06] | French: | Procédé d'enroulement d'une bande de matériau et dispositif de refendage de la bande | [2012/06] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0176230 (KATAOKA HIROSHI) [X] 1,14 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 11, line 5 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 3 * * page 13, lines 8-15 * * page 14, line 3 - page 15, paragraph 4 * * page 19, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 3 - page 21, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2-13,15-17; | [XI]JPS61111262 (KATAOKA KIKAI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,14 * figures 1-3 * * abstract * [I] 2-13,15-17; | [A]US3009666 (WILLIAM MOSER HENRY) [A] 1,14 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, lines 17,,30-37 * * column 3, lines 25-73 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB810433 (CAMERON MACHINE CO) [A] 1,14 * page 1, lines 30-52 * * page 1, line 76 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, lines 71-80,116-129 * * page 3, line 44 - page 4, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3687388 (PFEIFFER JOHN D) [A] 1,14 * column 1, lines 1-31 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 38 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1,2 * |