EP2367297 - Allocating traffic channels in a communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPR Licensing, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2017/52] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states IPR Licensing, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | ||
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states IPR Licensing, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue Suite 527 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornett, John B., Jr 503 4th Avenue Melbourne Beach, FL Florida 32951 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Kevin, P. 605 Pinehurst Circle N.E. Palm Bay, FL Florida 32905 / US | 03 /
Nelson, George, R., Jr. 207 Sykes Loop Drive Merritt Island, FL Florida 32953 / US | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/38] | Loqvist, Gabriel Mathias, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11170042.3 | 22.01.2003 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | US20020350835P | 22.01.2002 Original published format: US 350835 P | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2367297 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2367297 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2367297 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/216, H04J3/00 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,KR,NO,US);
H04B7/216 (US);
H04L5/003 (KR);
H04W68/02 (KR);
H04W72/02 (NO,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/38] | Title | German: | Zuteilen von Verkehrskanälen in einem Kommunikationssystem | [2011/38] | English: | Allocating traffic channels in a communications system | [2011/38] | French: | Allocation de voies de trafic dans un système de communications | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 21.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.04.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03705878.1 / EP1474881 | Divisional application(s) | EP13154893.5 / EP2595327 | EP13154906.5 / EP2595328 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2003 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | IE | 22.01.2018 | LU | 22.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.01.2003 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.01.2018 | ||
LU | 22.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.01.2018 | ||
LU | 22.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.01.2018 | ||
LU | 22.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.01.2018 | ||
LU | 22.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/26] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5150361 (WIECZOREK ALFRED B [US], et al); | [A]WO0186837 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) | Examination | US2002163894 |